Griffin v. Hickenlooper et al
Plaintiff: Eldridge L. Griffin
Defendant: Bernadette (I) Scott, Bernadette Scott, Roberts, Amy Cosner, Raidah Shepard, John Hickenlooper, Amy (I) Cosner, Tom Clemets, (I) Roberts and Raidah (I) Shepard
Case Number: 1:2012cv01379
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff Eldridge L. Griffin re: 77 Order Adopting Recommendation on Motion to Dismiss. Costs awarded to Defendants. Entered by Clerk on 06/06/13. (ebutl, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 76 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 46 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Amended Complaint ECF No. 14 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Defendants shall have their costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/4/2013.(ervsl, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 plaintiff's Motion to: Amend Complaint and Sanction Defendants, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/16/2013.(mjwcd)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 plaintiffs Motion to: Include Supporting Fact, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2013.(ervsl, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER DENYING as MOOT 26 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs Motion for Accommodations for ADA When in the Hole, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/1/2012.(ervsl, )
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Status Conference set for 10/15/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/12/2012. (ervsl, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants John Hickenlooper, DOC Executive Director Tom Clements, Parole Officer Roberts, Raidah Shepard, and the Defendant identified as Jane and John Doe are dismissed as parties to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/10/12. (lygsl, )
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/05/12 DENYING without prejudice 18 Plaintiff Motion for Accommodations for ADA When in the Hole.(nmmsl, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER To Discharge 15 Order to Show Cause to Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/04/12. (nmmsl, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/29/12 GRANTING 10 Motion to Strike ; and GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court will not consider the amended complaint 6 filed on 6/18/12. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 8/1/12 to filed an amended complaint per Court Order 5 dated 5/31/12. (nmmsl, )
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/25/12 GRANTING 7 Motion to Return Original Exhibits. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this minute order and the original exhibits submitted to the court on 5/25/12, to plaintiff. (nmmsl, )
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/31/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Hickenlooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette (I) Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Cosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raidah Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickenlooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy (I) Cosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clemets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raidah (I) Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldridge L. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?