USA v. 11843 Hannibal Street, Commerce City, CO et al.
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $15,232.74 seized from TCF National Bank acct XXXXXX6528, $5,525.59 seized from Public Service Credit Union acct XXXXXX9267, Rolex Explorer II watch, Tag Heuer Aquaracer ladies watch, Rolex Sub Mariner watch seized from Chase safe deposit box 6062-8, $6,195.00 in United States currency, $2,068.00 in United States currency, $450.00 in United States currency, LG 60" plasma television serial, #907RMAQ153088, $2,994.00 in United States currency, seventeen silver bars and nine silver coins, Eight miscellaneous gold coins and one gold bar, Fifty one-dollar coins, $11,019.88 seized from Public Service Credit Union acct XXXXXX3027, $10,996.76 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct XXXXX0604, $5,610.15 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct XXXXX2438, $2,280.00 in United States currency, gold and diamond bracelet, 2007 Toyota Tundrea SR5, VIN #5TFBV54137X024482, $5,560.00 in United States currency, $760.00 in United States currency, Six silver bars, $1,988.00 in United States currency, $7,910.00 in United States currency, $6,500.00 seized from US Bank safe deposit box 1794-1, $1,125.31 seized from Bellco Credit Union acct XXXXX7229, 7361 Mad River Road, Mad River, CA, 2001 Ford F-250 XL, VIN 1FTNW21F01EA67656, 2000 Volvo S80 VIN #YV1TS90DXY1094497, $10,315.00 In U.S. Currency, $6,934.00 In United States Currency, $4,130.00 In United States Currency, $3,967.00 In United States Currency, $1,091.00 In United States Currency, $30,947.50 Seized from E-Trade Acct. XXXXXX8410, $30,007.82 Seized from US Bank acct. XXXXXXXX1124, $25,629.65 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct.XXXXXXX6097, $19,680.12 seized from First Bank acct XXXXXX1991, $16,019.66 seized from Core First Bank & Trust XXX7692, $10,572.89 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX0439, $6,200.50 seized frim Edward Jones acct XXXX4700-1-0, $5,899.72 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX6172, $5,666.93 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX0698, $2,937.27 seized from Bellco Credit Union acct XXXXX7138 and 11843 Hannibal Street, Commerce City, CO
Case Number: 1:2012cv01433
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice Certain Defendant Assets. Motion to Dismiss from the Verified Complaint without Prejudice Certain Defendant Assets Claimed by Drew Jeffrey and/or Christina McCarthy [# 70 ] is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/6/2013.(klyon, )
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 68 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property, by Clerk on 4/30/2013. (klyon, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANT PROPERTIES CONCERNING JORDAN BUEHRER. Unopposed Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture as to Certain DefendantProperties Concerning Jordan Buehrer [# 67 ] is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter. That a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is grantedpursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/29/2013.(klyon, )
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Final JUDGMENT Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.54(b) by Clerk in favor of 2007 Toyota Tundrea SR5, VIN #5TFBV54137X024482 against Joanne S. Gleason re: 64 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property, by Clerk on 4/19/2013. (klyon, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT 2007 TOYOTA TUNDRA SR5, VIN #5TFBV54137X024482. The United States' Unopposed Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture only as to Defendant 2007 Toyota Tundra SR5, VIN #5TFBV54137X024482 [# 63 ]is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/2013.(klyon, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) by Clerk in favor of USA against $1,988.00 in United States currency, $2,280.00 in United States currency, $5,560.00 in United States currency, $7,910.00 in United States currency, $760.00 in United States currency, Six silver bars, gold and diamond bracelet re: 60 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations. By Clerk on 4/9/13. (kfinn, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER adopting 58 Report and Recommendations; granting 56 Motion for Default and Final Order of Forfeiture as to Certain Defendants. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/8/13. (kfinn, )
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against $6,500.00 seized from US Bank safe deposit box 1794-1 by Clerk on 12/10/2012. (klyon, )
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Approving and Adopting 52 Report and Recommendation Regarding the United States' Motion for Default and Final Order of Forfeiture Only as to Defendant $65,00.00 Seized From US Bank Safe Deposit Box 1794-1 (Docket No. 49)of the Unite d States Magistrate Judge. Order granting the government's 49 Motion for Default and Final Order of Forfeiture Only as to Defendant $6,500.00 Seized From US Bank Safe Deposit Box 1794-1 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/2012. (klyon, )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 44 United States' Motion To Strike Claimant Gleason's Second and Third Defenses. The Second Defense and Third Defense, set forth at paragraphs 109-111, page 21-22 of Claimant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem 35 are STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/5/12. (kfinn, )
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion by Claimant, Drew Jeffrey, to Stay Proceedings. These proceedings are STAYED as to Claimant Drew Jeffrey, pending the outcome of the related criminal case concerning Claimant Drew Jeffrey, pending in Adams County District court, case number 12CR227. Claimant need not file an answer in this matter until further order of this Court. Claimant shall advise the court by written notice within twenty days of the resolution of that case as far as it concerns him. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/23/2012.(mjwcd, )
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion by Claimant, Christina McCarthy to StayProceedings. These proceedings are STAYED as to Claimant Christina McCarthy, pending the outcome of the related criminal case pending in Adams County District court, case number 12 CR 530. Claimant need not file an answer in this matter until further order of this Court. Claimant shall advise the court by written notice within twenty days of the resolution of that case as far as it concerns her. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2012.(mjwcd)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING A PARTY granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff's claims against defendant LG 60" Plasma Television Serial #907RMAQ153088 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and defendant LG 60" Plasma Television Serial #907RMAQ153088 is DROPPED as a party to this action, and the caption shall be amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/12.(mjgsl, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER For Warrant For Arrest Of Personal Property In Rem. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/4/12.(mjgsl, ) Modified on 6/4/2012 remove linkage (mjgsl, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 11843 Hannibal Street, Commerce City, CO et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,232.74 seized from TCF National Bank acct XXXXXX6528
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,525.59 seized from Public Service Credit Union acct XXXXXX9267
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex Explorer II watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tag Heuer Aquaracer ladies watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex Sub Mariner watch seized from Chase safe deposit box 6062-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,195.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,068.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $450.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG 60" plasma television serial, #907RMAQ153088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,994.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: seventeen silver bars and nine silver coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight miscellaneous gold coins and one gold bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifty one-dollar coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,019.88 seized from Public Service Credit Union acct XXXXXX3027
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,996.76 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct XXXXX0604
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,610.15 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct XXXXX2438
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,280.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gold and diamond bracelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Toyota Tundrea SR5, VIN #5TFBV54137X024482
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,560.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $760.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six silver bars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,988.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,910.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,500.00 seized from US Bank safe deposit box 1794-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,125.31 seized from Bellco Credit Union acct XXXXX7229
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7361 Mad River Road, Mad River, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2001 Ford F-250 XL, VIN 1FTNW21F01EA67656
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2000 Volvo S80 VIN #YV1TS90DXY1094497
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,315.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,934.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,130.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,967.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,091.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,947.50 Seized from E-Trade Acct. XXXXXX8410
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,007.82 Seized from US Bank acct. XXXXXXXX1124
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,629.65 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank acct.XXXXXXX6097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,680.12 seized from First Bank acct XXXXXX1991
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,019.66 seized from Core First Bank & Trust XXX7692
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,572.89 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX0439
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,200.50 seized frim Edward Jones acct XXXX4700-1-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,899.72 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX6172
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,666.93 seized from US Bank acct XXXXXXXX0698
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,937.27 seized from Bellco Credit Union acct XXXXX7138
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11843 Hannibal Street, Commerce City, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?