Mauchlin v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Peter P. Mauchlin
Defendant: B.R. Davis, Zhan, Munsen, Milusnic, P. Rangel, T. Sudlow, D. Foster, Krist, Loyd, G. Jensen and W. Barry
Case Number: 1:2012cv01449
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/15/16. Finding good cause for the requested deposition of Plaintiff Peter Mauchlin, the court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Order Permitting Deposition of Federal Bureau of Prisons Inmate Mauchlin 198 . Defendants are granted leave to depose Mr. Mauchlin beginning at 9:00 a.m. on April 6, 2016 at the AD/MAX facility in Florence, Colorado. (bsimm, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 193 Declaration and Motion for Relief; OVERRULING Plaintiff's Objection to 192 ; Sworn Declaration (ECF No. 194) filed February 23, 2016, is STRICKEN as duplicative of the Sworn Declaration 193 filed February 16, 2016; and Th at Plaintiff shall properly title all future filings with the court, titling any objections to any order or recommendation by a magistrate judge as an Objection, and titling requests for relief from the court as a Motion. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/25/2016.(cthom, )
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/2/16. The Renewed Motion 179 is hereby DENIED. (bsimm, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying without prejudice 163 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/21/15.(nmarb, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 163 ) is GRANTED as to his request to open this case. This case and 163 Motion requesting appointment of counsel is referred Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments on the required filing fee or show cause why he has no assets and no means by which to make each monthly payment, in accordance with the Magistrate Judge's Order dated June 6, 2012 (ECF No. 4 ). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/01/2015. (athom, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER adopting 160 Report and Recommendations. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter, pursuant to Local Rule 41.2, subject to reopening for good cause subsequent to Plaintiffs vision problems being addressed and STAYS Plaintiff's obligation to pay the filing fee or to show cause as why he has no assets and no means by which to make each monthly payment until such time that the case is reopened 4 . By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/3/2015.(tscha, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS, AFFIRMS, and MODIFIES the 132 Recommendation, to wit, the Court AFFIRMS all aspects of the Recommendation and MODIFIES the Recommendation by finding that Defendant Davis is entitled to qualified immunity; and GRANTS in Part and DENIES in Part 121 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/9/2014.(alowe)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 7(b)(1) and Rule 15(a)(2) Fed.R.Civ.P. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 106 -1) for filing. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/26/13. (alvsl)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on the Defendants Motion to Vacate Preliminary Scheduling Conference and Stay Discovery docket no. 101 , filed August 9, 2013 (the Motion). IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. The Preliminary Scheduling Conference will go forward as originally set on September 4, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/15/2013.(ervsl, )
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Strike. Documents 20 , 24 , 73 , and 94 are STRICKEN. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/8/13.(bnbcd, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Documents ## 22, 25, 28, 30, 31, 37, 46, 54, 55, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61, 64, 66, 67, 74, 76,84, 86, 87, and 88 are STRICKEN; The plaintiff shall cease filing letters and notices. All future requests for relief shallbe filed in the form of a motion in compliance with Rules 7 and 10. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/13. (bnbcd, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/02/12. (nmmsl, )
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/18/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauchlin v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter P. Mauchlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milusnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Sudlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?