April 10, 2020 |
Filing
462
ORDER Striking 455 Mr. Bacote's Motion for Order Confirming [that he] Appropriately Exercised his Right Not to Be Bound by Settlement Agreement, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/10/2020.(evana, )
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
350
ORDER Granting 349 Defendant's Motion to Strike Docket Number 346. The motion is granted and the Third Amended Complaint tendered by Harold Cunningham 346 is stricken, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/13/16. (ktera)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
348
ORDER Denying Motion to Intervene filed by Antoine Bruce 345 for the reasons stated in Defendant's Response to Docket Number 345, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/7/16. (ktera)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
330
ORDER Granting 329 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Deadlines in the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/22/15. (ktera)
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing
324
ORDER ON CLA STANDING The CLA has established standing to pursue claims for declaratory and injunctive relief for prisoners with mental illness housed at ADX, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/3/15. (ktera)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
312
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2015. 305 Motion to Compel is continued. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rkeec)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
297
ORDER Granting 296 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule for 288 , Plaintiffs shall respond to 288 no later than September 4, 2015, and Defendants shall file any reply no later than September 25, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/18/15. (ktera)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
279
MINUTE ORDER The unopposed motion to set a status and discovery planning conference 277 is granted. The conference is scheduled for July 30, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/30/15.(ktera)
|
April 1, 2015 |
Filing
263
ORDER Granting 262 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Vacate Deadline for Endorsing Experts, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/1/15. (ktera)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
261
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE 260 Conference set for 4/22/2015 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/24/15. (ktera)
|
February 23, 2015 |
Filing
257
MINUTE ORDER denying 253 Motion for Order Seeking Joinder; denying as moot 254 Motion for Copies by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/23/2015.(mdave ) Modified on 2/24/2015 to edit text(mdave ).
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
252
ORDER granting 251 the Joint Motion to Stay and to Extend Deadlines. The proceedings in this case are stayed, with the exception of written discovery, document production, and the continuing settlement conferences, up to and including February 25, 2015. Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/3/2015.(evana, )
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
248
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 241 Motion/Notification [to Dismiss] filed by Antoine Bruce, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/27/2015.(evana, )
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
231
ORDER granting 230 Fourth Joint Motion to Stay and to Extend Deadlines by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/15/14.(jhawk, )
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
226
ORDER On August 26, 2014, this Court entered an Order Granting Third Joint Motion to Stay and to Extend Deadlines. That stay order expired on November 25, 2014. In the same order, times for discovery were extended. It is now ORDERED that on or before December 15, 2014, the parties shall submit a status report to enable the Court to set a hearing on the pending motion for class certification. Status Report due by 12/15/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/1/2014. (evana, )
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
220
ORDER Granting 219 Motion to Stay and Extend Deadlines re 11 : Discovery due by 3/31/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2015; Expert reports and Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures for the party bearing the burden of persuasion on the issues for which the opinions are offered: December 1, 2014; Contradicting expert reports and Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures: January 2, 2015; Any rebuttal opinions: February 2, 2015; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions: June 24, 2015; and Replies to Oppositions to Dispositive Motions: July 17, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/25/2014.(jsmit)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
213
Second Supplement to PROTECTIVE ORDER re 212 , 167 , and 85 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/18/2014. (jsmit)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
209
ORDER Granting 208 Second Joint Motion to Stay and to Extend Deadlines re 100 : Discovery due by 12/31/2014 and Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2015 (see Order for other deadlines) by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/6/2014. (jsmit )
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing
201
ORDER Granting 200 Motion for Protective Order: counsel for the plaintiff shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/21/2014.(jsmit)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
195
ORDER Granting 194 Motion to Stay: proceedings in this case are stayed, with the exception of written discovery, document production, and the continuing settlement conferences, up to and including June 13, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2014.(jsmit)
|
March 11, 2014 |
Filing
181
Order Granting Jeremy Pinson's Motion to Terminate Counsel And Denying Pinson's Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Jeremy Pinson's Motion for Order to Terminate Counsel and For Records 155 is granted. Plaintiffs' counsel shall forward the case file as it relates to Pinson at their earliest convenience, consistent with the Court's August 6, 2013 Protective Order 85 . Jeremy Pinson's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 168 is denied. Defendant's Motion to Strike Docket Number 168 , 179 is dismissed as moot. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/11/2014.(rpmcd)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
167
Supplement to 85 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 164 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2014. (rpmcd )
|
December 6, 2013 |
Filing
142
ORDER Granting 141 Motion for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Witness Dawane Mallett, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/6/2013.(rpmcd)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
122
Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 92 , is taken under advisement. Defendant's stipulation due November 15, 2013. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
118
ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Strike 105 Letter : stricken pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/28/2013.(rpmcd )
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
110
ORDER re 108 : on or before October 25, 2013, Defendant file a sur-reply limited to addressing the factual allegations contained in the Declarations, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/16/2013. (rpmcd )
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing
85
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 84 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/6/2013. (rpmcd )
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing
77
ORDER Granting 76 Motion for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Witness Richie Antonio Hill, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/22/2013 (12-cv-01144-RPM and 12-cv-01570-RPM).(rpmcd )
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
73
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 72 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/20/2013. (rpmcd, )
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER Granting 68 Motion for Leave: Plaintiffs in both of the above captioned actions are granted leave to take the deposition of JOHN J. POWERS (BOP Register No. 03220-028) at the United States Medical Center for Federal Prisoners in Springfield, Missouri, beginning on June 25, 2013, and continuing thereafter until completed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/17/2013.(rpmcd)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR., PAUL M. LAIRD, AND BLAKE R. DAVIS, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/23/2013. (rpmcd)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Withdraw [37-2] : The version of the Aro Declaration originally filled as an attachment to Plaintiffs' Response shall be removed from the public file in this case and replaced with the revised version [47-1], by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/7/2012.(rpmcd)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
40
ORDER Amending Case Caption re 38 : The names of former Plaintiff Michael Bacote and former Defendant Newton E. Kendig shall be removed from the case caption, and the caption shall be amended to reflect the correct spelling of Defendant David Berkebile's last name, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/26/2012. (rpmcd)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER denying 7 Motion to Intervene by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/12/12.(jjhsl, )
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/19/12. (mnfsl, )
|