January 6, 2016 |
Filing
164
ORDER DETERMINING COSTS The Plaintiff's motion for review of the Clerk's assessment of SG Interests' costs 161 is granted. The Clerk's award of $15,518.26 for "transfer & organization of data" is reduced to 36;992 (a reduction of $14,526.26). The Clerk's taxation of SG's costs 154 is vacated. The total amount of costs taxed against the Plaintiff and in favor of Defendants SG Interests I, Ltd. and SG Interests VII, Ltd. is $44,580.24, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/6/16. (ktera)
|
September 25, 2015 |
Filing
139
JUDGMENT by Clerk Pursuant to the Order Granting Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, all of plaintiff's claims and this civil action are dismissed. Defendants are awarded costs upon the filing of a bill of costs within 14 days, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/15. (ktera)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
134
COURTROOM MINUTES for Motions Hearing held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2015. Denying 132 Defendant Gunnison Energy Corporation's Motion to Amend August 21 Order under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), and for a Stay. Denying 133 Defend ants SG Interests I, Ltd. and SG Interests VII, Ltd.'s Motion for Authority to Seek Immediate Appeal of Non-Final Rulings. Denying for purposes of summary judgment only 120 Motion to Exclude, 121 Motion to Exclude, 122 Motion in Limine, a nd 123 Motion to Exclude. Taking under advisement 89 Defendant Gunnison Energy Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Taking under advisement 94 Defendant SG Interests' Motion for Summary Judgment. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
|
August 21, 2015 |
Filing
130
RULINGS ON CERTAIN ISSUES PRESENTED IN DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Defendant Gunnison Energy Corporation's motion for summary judgment is denied as to the issues of release and res judicata. The motion for summary judgment of Defendants SG Interests I, Ltd. and SG Interests VII, Ltd. is denied as to the issues of res judicata and statute of limitations, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/21/15. (ktera)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
125
ORDER Deferring ruling on 120 Motion to Exclude; deferring ruling on 121 Motion to Exclude; deferring ruling on 122 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 123 Motion to Exclude. The subject of these motions will not be considered until after the oral argument on August 26, 2015. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that these motions will not be considered before oral argument on August 26,2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/7/2015.(evana, )
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
88
ORDER granting 87 the unopposed motion to extend the deadline, to and including March 16, 2015, for the parties to submit dispositive motions. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the April 8, 2015, pretrial conference is vacated, to be reset at a later date, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/2015.(evana, )
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
85
ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2015 11:00 AM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 2, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2015. (evana, )
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER Amending Scheduling Order re 83 ,. 67 and 80 : Discovery due by 2/13/2015]; deadline for Defendants to submit expert disclosures responsive to Buccaneer's expert disclosures is extended to December 23, 2014; deadline for Buccaneer to submit rebuttal reports in support of Buccaneer's expert disclosures is extended to January 16, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/21/2014.(jsmit)
|
July 25, 2014 |
Filing
74
Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 68 , is held in abeyance and counsel shall withdraw motion if issue is resolved. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
|
January 31, 2014 |
Filing
63
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/14/2014 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 6, 2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/31/2014., (rpmcd )
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER to Comply with D.C. COLO.L.CivR 7.2, The Court has signed a Protective Order for the confidentiality of certain information in this case. The order does not expressly provide for compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 in court filings. It is ORDERED, that in all court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2013. (ervsl, )
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing
43
Minute ORDER Setting Second Scheduling Conference for 7/1/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, re 42 Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/28/2013. (rpmcd )
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER FOR SECOND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: a second scheduling conference will be convened at a time to be set after determining the schedules of counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/21/2013. (rpmcd )
|
February 25, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2013 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 28, 2013, lead counsel present in lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd)
|
December 14, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER Denying 21 Motion to Dismiss filed by SGI and the Third Claim for Relief is dismissed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/14/2012.(rpmcd )
|