Gomez v. Account Brokers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tommy J. Gomez
Defendant: Account Brokers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01680
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 08/28/13. (alvsl)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Vacating Trial and Setting Filing Deadline by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/12/13. Dismissal papers, or a status report, due by 8/23/2013. (dkals, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference held on 7/31/2013 before Judge Raymond P. Moore, granting 39 Motion in Limine and 40 Motion in Limine. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Three-day Jury Trial set for 8/12/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/26/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/13/13. (mnfsl, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off. Discovery extended to 1/25/2013 for limited purpose of deposing Melissa Gomez. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/3/13.(bnbcd, )
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/12. (bnbcd, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, scheduling order to be submitted by 9/21/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/12. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Account Brokers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy J. Gomez
Represented By: Jill Gookin
Represented By: Andrea Carter Fulton
Represented By: Troy Dean Krenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Brokers, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?