Toy v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Toy
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv01683
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Elbert
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' OBJECTIONS TO DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF BRUCE PROCTOR. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/14/14. (mfiel, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Regarding the Parties' Objections to Designations of Deposition Testimony of Victoria Mrowiec by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/11/14. (jhawk, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying 191 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Misrepresenting the Law Concerning Burden of Proof by Presenting Argument and Evidence at Trial Suggesting Defendant Has an Obligation to Help Plaintiff Prove His Claims. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/6/14. (pabsec)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Plaintiff's Motion to Limit Testimony of Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Expert Witness John Craver as indicated in this order. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/31/14.(mfiel, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER. Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part as indicated in this order. Defendant's 109 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Plaintiff's 125 Motion for Leave to File Surreply is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/29/14.(mfiel, )
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/5/2013. Granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion for Sanctions. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (lag)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER Granting 144 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider and/or Vacate Minute Order Granting Docket No. 135 and for Acceptance of Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(b)(2). Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 135 is a pending motion. Telephonic Motion Hearing re Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 135 set for 9/5/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/3/2013.(mjwcd)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Five-day Jury Trial set for 2/18/2014 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/22/13. (mnfsl, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER granting 135 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [sic] 37(b)(2), by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/21/2013.(mjwcd)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 46 Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/13/13.(mnfsl, )
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER granting 126 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference 7/9/2013 09:00 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/27/2013.(mjwcd)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 111 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Compel Production of "Colorado Business Plans" as outlined in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/18/13.(mnfsl, )
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER granting 103 defendant's Motion for Amendment of Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to Depose Plaintiff. Amended Scheduling Order 64 is amended. Discovery for the limited purpose of deposing plaintiff Gregory Toy is extended to 6/17/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2013.(mjwcd)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, as set forth in the order. Scheduling Order 20 is amended to extend the discovery cut-off date up to and including 5/16/2013 for the limited purpose of Defendant's deposition of Plaintiff Gregory Toy. Discovery due by 5/16/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/16/2013.(mjwcd)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 95 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Take Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company after Discovery Deadline, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2013.(mjwcd)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Defendant's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Re: Discovery and Alternative Dispute Resolution Deadline. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/13.(mnfsl, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions, as outlined in the order. Granting in part and denying in part 76 Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions, as outlined in the order. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2013.(mjwcd)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 59 defendant's Motion for Protective Order, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/2013.(mjwcd)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Request for Forthwith Ruling. Discovery due by 5/1/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/19/12.(dkals, )
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Compel 36 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/13/2012.(cmacd)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave for Late Filing of Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to separately file the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 39-1) attached to the subject motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/21/12.(mnfsl, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. The Plaintiff is a granted leave to file his Amended Complaint within ten (10) days from the date of this minute order which adds a claim for bad faith breach of an insurance contract and a prayer for exemplary damages. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/29/12.(mnfsl, )
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/26/2012.(mjwcd)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion to Re-Schedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference 8/29/2012 02:30 PM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/18/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/11/2012.(mjwcd)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/6/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toy v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Toy
Represented By: Randall Keith Fuicelli
Represented By: Joshua David Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?