DeGourville v. Andrews International
Plaintiff: Anthony E DeGourville
Defendant: Tom Parrish, Robert Wibben, Pete Bradley, Marla Gibson, Andrews International and Tom Dahl
Case Number: 1:2012cv01784
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Andrews International against Anthony E DeGourville re: 84 Order, by Clerk on 8/22/2014. (eseam)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 81 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay this Action to Meet and Confirm Some Kind of Settlement to Resolve this Matter, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/2014. (eseam)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2014. ORDERED: The court will ACCEPT Plaintiff's oral Motion to Withdraw Doc. No. 71. 71 Motion to Subpoena Dispatch Tape Recordings, Email Correspondence is WITHDRAWN. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Service by United States Marshal. ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Title VII Complaint 8 on Defendant Andrews International. FURTHER ORDERED that after service of process, Defendant Andrews International shall respond to the Amended Title VII Complaint as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/13/13. (sgrim)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/04/12. (nmmsl, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeGourville v. Andrews International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wibben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E DeGourville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?