Bituminous Casualty Corporation v. Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas
Plaintiff: Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas
Case Number: 1:2012cv01802
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Auto Owners Insurance Company against Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas re: 156 Order, by Clerk on 2/7/2014. (klyon, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Between Bituminous Casualty Corporation and Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas. The Notice of Dismissal of Claims Between Bituminous Casualty Corporation and Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas [# 154 ] is APPROVED. The claims between Bituminous Casualty Corporation and Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/6/2014. (klyon, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE CUSTODY AND DISPOSITION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS, TRANSCRIPTS, AND PAPERS. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/13. (rebcd)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Bituminous Casualty Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment [# 60 ], F.R.E. 702 Motion To Preclude Expert Testimony of David McClain [# 101 ], Bituminous Casualty Corporation's Motion To Strike Roger H. Buelow 's Expert Report and Testimony [# 104 ], Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff's, Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Consolidated Motion For Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion For Determination of Law [#[107 ]], and Motion to Strike Exhibit A to Bituminous Casualty Corporation's Opposition to Trinity's F.R.E. 702 Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of David McLain (Doc. #110 filed 9/16/13) [# 117 ]. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/21/2013.(klyon, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/15/2013.(klyon, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2013. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 11/15/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/4/13. (rebsec, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER of Dismissal as to Third-Party Defendant, Axis Surplus Insurance Company Only. The Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice of TrinityUniversal Insurance Company of Kansas' Third Party Complaint Against AxisSurplus Insurance Company, Only [# 105 ] is GRANTED. Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas' Third Party Complaint against third-party defendant, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. Any motion filed on behalf of third-party defendant, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, is DENIED as moot. Third-party defendant, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/3/2013.(klyon, )
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Converted to Motion for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/12/2013.(klyon, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2013: granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Reconvene Scheduling Conference to extend all deadlines; denying without prejudice [64 ] Motion requesting AXIS's Motion for Summary Judgment be held in Abeyance and Motion requesting Discovery pursuant to 04/17/2013 Court Order; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion Requesting Discovery and Deferred Ruling on Bituminous Casualty Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Discovery due by 8/25/2013. Plaintiff's motion for Summary Judgment due by 07/15/2013. FTR: ncapp-C204. (klmcd)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re: 48 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Motion [# 48 ], filed as a motion to dismiss, is converted to a motion for summa ry judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(d). If any party seeks discovery prior to the Court's determination of the Motion, it must file a motion specifying the discovery sought on or before 4/26/2013. If no motion for discovery is filed, any add itional evidence the parties wish to submit in support of their arguments must be filed on or before 5/3/2013. The Court's permission to submit additional evidence should not be construed as an invitation for additional briefing regarding the Motion. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/2013. (klyon, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 53 Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Axis Surplus Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Further, the Court has already ordered that Defendant shall file a Response to the pending Motion to Dismiss 48 on or before 3/21/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Defendant's Third Party Complaint # 29 is accepted for filing as of 12/20/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2012. (klyon, )
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER; Defendant's 25 Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order at 24 is amended to extend the Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadngs from the current date of 11/30/2012 to 12/21/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/2/2012.(klmcd, )
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/15/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 12/2/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/18/12. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bituminous Casualty Corporation v. Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Represented By: John Edward Rodewald
Represented By: Steven Robert Kabler
Represented By: Daniel Adam Wartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas
Represented By: Nancy L. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?