Colorado Mills, LLC v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Colorado Mills, LLC
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv01830
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Joint Motion to Vacate Order on Motion to Compel: 60 Order is withdrawn by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/9/13.(dkals, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 44 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Include Request for Exemplary Damages and Moratory Interest and 78 Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/24/13.(dkals, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting 64 Forthwith Motion to Stay Discovery Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/15/13.(dkals, )
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/2/2013. (mehcd)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to file a Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Amended Reply in Support of Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/26/13.(dkals, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Fact discovery cutoff and Expert discovery cutoff are extended, and the Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 5/30/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/21/13.(dkals, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/27/12. (mnfsl, )
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/15/2013 and Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2013 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/24/12. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Mills, LLC v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Mills, LLC
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Jordan D. Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?