Sparks v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Thene Sparks
Defendant: Tejinder Singh, Lisa Hanks, Ted Lawrence, Michael Aasen, Robbie Quick, Tom Clements, Steve Hartley and Colorado Health Partners
Case Number: 1:2012cv01897
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting Case for Trial: 3 day Jury Trial set for 8/8/2016, 08:30 AM start first day and 9:00 AM start the remaining days, in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/8/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/17/2015. (cthom, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER granting 116 Third Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 83 is amended. Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/1/2015.(emill)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 83 is amended. Non-expert Discovery due by 9/21/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2015. Final Pretrial Conference 11/30/2015 10:00 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/17/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/3/2015.(emill)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER granting 102 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/20/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/2015.(tscha, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to conduct deposition of Incarcerated Inmate, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/13/2015.(tscha, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER granting 91 Motion to Amend Scheduling order. Discovery due by 4/17/2015. Discovery cut-off is extended to 5/20/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/19/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/2015.(tscha, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER adopting Magistrate's recommendations 54 and 55 and overruling plaintiff's objections 57 . Plaintiff's motion 77 is denied as moot. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/8/2014.(trlee, )
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting 70 Request for Status by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/21/14.(dkals, )
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Withdrawing "Order Adopting Recommendation that the Claiims Against Defendant Michael Aasen be Dismissed (ECF No. 54 )" (ECF No. 56 ). The Court will issue a new order after consideration of the Objection and any other response. SO ORDERED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/29/13. (alvsl)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Adopting 54 Recommendation that the Claims Against Defendant Michael Aasen be Dismissed. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Michael Aasen are DISMISSED without prejudice. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/25/13. (alvsl)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 defendants' Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference Set for May 8, 2013 Pending Resolution of Qualified Immunity. Scheduling Conference 5/8/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. The Show Cause Hearing 5/8/2013 09:30 AM remains set and will be held as scheduled. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2013.(mjwcd)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. Denying as moot 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify. Show Cause Hearing / Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 2/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/13. (dkals, )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part. ORDERED that the Complaint and claims asserted against Tejinder Singh, Lisa Hanks, Ted Lawrence, Michael Aasen, Tom Clements, Steve Hartley, and Colorado Health Partners shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Robbie Quick is dismissed from the action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/16/13. (sgrim)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/15/13, Directing Prison To Disburse Funds for Monthly Payments re: 13 Authorization, filed by Stephen Thene Sparks. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (nmmsl, )
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Discharging 9 Order to Show Cause. ORDERED Mr. Sparks complete and return the attached authorization form to the Court within thirty days of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/21/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Thene Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?