Ellis v. J.R.'s Country Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra Ellis
Defendant: J.R.'s Country Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01916
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying as moot 13 Motion to Certify Conditionally a Collective Action, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/12/13. This case is dismissed with prejudice, and J.R.s Country Stores, Inc. shall have its costs.(dkals, )
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Unopposed Motion to Amend and Correct Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/13.(dkals, )
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2013. (klmcd, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER; 25 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2013 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 5/23/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Parties shall submit the proposed scheduling order no later than 5/17/2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/2013.(klmcd, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Stay and Denying 15 Motion to Defer Judgment: 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response is denied as moot, and proceedings related to 13 Motion to Certify Conditionally a Collective Action are stayed until 8 Motion for Summary Judgment is ruled on. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/12.(dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. J.R.'s Country Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ellis
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R.'s Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Dow Hammond
Represented By: Lawrence Daniel Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?