Madrigal v. Carroll et al
Plaintiff: Margarita Madrigal, Maribel Madrigal, Rosa Maria Madrigal and Jose Madrigal
Defendant: Randall Carroll, Craig Collins, Kevin Rollins, Timothy Dufour, J.D. Wykstra, Leland Silver, Daniel J. Oates and City of Aurora, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv01918
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER. Ordered that 200 Unopposed Motion for Order to Disburse Funds from Registry of the Court is Granted. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/15/2015.(agarc, )
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. The Unopposed Status Report 196 is construed as a motion to reopen this case and is granted. The Motion to Deposit Funds in Court Registry 191 is granted. Within 7 days of entry of this Order, defendants shall deposit $400,000 into the Court registry. Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement 189 is denied. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Request to Set Telephone Conference or Hearing 197 is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/4/15.(pabsec)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER. ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending further order of this Court. ORDERED that the parties shall file, either jointly or separately, a status report within 30 days of any action that provides a basis for reopening this case. The status report shall indicate what the action was, the purported impact, and how the party or parties intend to proceed in this case by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/30/14. (jhawk, )
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE ORDER : Granting 178 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 48 is amended. Discovery due by 8/7/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2014. Final Pretrial Conference 7/7/2014 09:00 AM is vacated. Denying without prejudice 136 Motion for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 145 Motion to Deny Defendant's Request for Attorney's Fees. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2014.(emill)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER granting 167 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadline. Scheduling Order 48 is amended. Discovery due by 5/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2014. Final Pretrial Conference remains set 7/7/2014 09:00 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/2014.(emill)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the Joint Motion to Schedule Settlement Conference [Docket No. 159 ]. Magistrate Judge Kristin L. Mix is authorized to conduct a settlement conference or early neutral evaluation. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/7/2014.(klyon, )
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 108 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, as set forth in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2014.(mjwcd)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Defendant Leland Silver's Motion to Stay Discovery and Motion for Protective Order on Behalf of Defendants Silver, Collins and Wykstra. A Protective Order pursuant to Rule 26(c) shall enter, as set forth in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/12/2013.(mjwcd)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 65 Defendants Carroll, Collins, Silver and Wyukstra, in their individual capacities Motion to Enforce Protective Order, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/13/2013.(mjwcd)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's Order [docket no. 71 ] Granting Motion to Stay Discovery As To Defendants' (sic) Collins, Wykstra and Dufour As Fact Witnesses. This court's minute order(docket no. 71 ) is MODIFIED consistent with this minute order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/18/2013.(klyon, )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER The parties telephoned Magistrate Judge Watanabe's chambers during the eposition of Defendant J. D. Wykstra. Granting Plaintiff's Oral Motion to Not Allow the Defendant Police Officers from having their weapons on their pe rsons during depositions, as set forth in the order. Granting 68 Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendants Collins, Wykstra and Dufour, as set forth in the order. Defendants shall pay reasonable attorney fees as set forth in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2013.(mjwcd)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2013. (mjwcd)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/12. (Redacted version of 11 Order pursuant to 20 Order entered 9/27/12) (mnfsl, )
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/12. (mnfsl, )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL asking reassignment to another judge, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/13/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrigal v. Carroll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Madrigal
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Madrigal
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Maria Madrigal
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Madrigal
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Wykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?