Malibu Media v. John Does 1-42
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-42
Case Number: 1:2012cv01953
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Does 7, 9, 10, 11, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED that John Doe 39 is TERMINATED. Finally, since all Defendants have now been dismissed from the case, it is Ordered that this case is Terminated by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/16/13. (jjhsl, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge dated June 25, 2013, 161 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe # 22's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Standing 107 is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/15/13.(jjhsl, )
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER. ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 158 is APPROVED. Plaintiff's and Defendant Brian Batz's claims against each other are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and cost s. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Plaintiff's Counterclaim 103 is DENIED AS MOOT, and the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge filed on May 17, 2013, that addresses the above motion 147 is also MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/17/13.(jjhsl, )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Order granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Leaveby Telephone. The Status Conference currently scheduled for June 4, 2013 is vacat ed and rescheduled to Friday, June 14, 2013 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom A501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Counsel for Plaintiff and Mr. Batz may appear telephonically at the June 14, 2013 Status Conference scheduled in this case by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/03/13.(jjhsl, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 69 Defendant Doe 22's Motion to Sever and Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2013. (mehcd)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Tara W. Cameron is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. ORDERED that "Tara W. Cameron's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Compl aint 82 , Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), with Accompanying Authority" (ECF No. 99) and "Tara W. Cameron's Motion to Dismiss, Adopting John Doe 22's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Standing" (ECF No. 115) are DENIED AS MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/17/13.(jjhsl, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 120 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Brian Batz's Defenses [CM/ECF 100]" 102 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to Mr. Batz's First, Fifth, Sixth and Eight Defenses, and they are STRICKEN. It is DENIED as to Mr. Batz's Third, Fourth, Seventh and Ninth Defenses by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/15/13.(jjhsl, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER granting 138 Defendant Brian Batz's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference for Status Conference Set for May 16, 2013 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Mr. Batz may appear telephonically at the 5/16/2013 Status Conference scheduled in this case by calling my Chambers at (303)844-4507 at the appointed time. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/14/2013. (mehcd)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 129 Defendant Brian Batz's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference for Status Conference Set for May 08, 2013 10:00 a.m., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/9/2013. (mehcd)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. ORDERED that the parties file statements with the Court on or before Monday, February 11, 2013, advising whether the Court should consider the materials attached by Plaintiff to its response brief and whether Defendant Cameron's motion to dismiss should be converted to a motion for summary judgment by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/31/13. (jjhsl, )
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 1, 5, 37, 38, 40, 41 and 42 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/30/12. (jjhsl, )
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Defendant Doe #41's Unopposed Motion to Maintain Records Under Seal and for Entry of Protective Order to Maintain and Preserve Doe 41's Anonymity, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/29/2012.(ervsl, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 80 Doe #22's Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/27/2012. (mehcd)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint, and granting in part and denying in part 76 Defendant Doe #41's Unopposed Motion for Seven Day (7) Extension of Time From the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Most Current Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter [74-1] Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint as filed and to amend the case caption accordingly. Defendant Doe #41's answer due by 11/26/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2012. (mehcd)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 2 and 32 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant John Doe 2 and John Doe 32 Only 71 . Defendants John Doe 2 and John Doe 32 shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/16/12. (jjhsl, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 4, 6, 8, 12 and 13 are DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE. Defendants John Doe 4, 6, 8, 12 and 13 shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/12. (jjhsl, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER striking 49 John Doe No. 22's Motion to Sever and Dismiss; striking 55 Defendant Doe #41's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 20(a) or Alternatively to Sever and Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20( a) and 21 and Defendant Doe #41's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 20(a) or Alternatively to Sever and Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a) and 21 ECF No. 56 are stricken because they collectively exceed the page limits set forth of my Practice Standards. A party may not avoid the page limits by filing a motion and separate brief, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/8/2012.(ervsl, )
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER. Motion to Quash 47 is denied without prejudice. Continued Request to Proceed Anonymously 45 is granted as set forth in this Minute Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this minute order to Doe #22 at the address provided in docket #35 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/24/12.(jjhsl, )
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Doe #41's Unopposed Motion for ContinuedPermission to Proceed Anonymously 43 and Defendant Doe #41's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint 42 . Both motions are granted as set forth in this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/12.(jjhsl, )
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Modification of Order of September 27, 2012 30 . Doe #41 may proceed in this litigation anonymously through and including October 19, 2012, for the sole purpose of filing a motion to di smiss, a motion to sever, or negotiating a settlement with Plaintiff. In accordance with this order, Plaintiff is prohibited from publicly disclosing Doe #41's identity until further order of the Court by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/02/12.(jjhsl, )
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 14 only is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant John Doe 14 Only by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/01/12. (jjhsl, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute ORDER. Doe #41's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 25 is granted in part for the sole purpose of permitting Doe #41 to challenge the subpoena served on CenturyLink. Doe #41's Motion for Leave to File Under Restriction the Sup plement to the Motion to Proceed Anonymously 26 is granted in part and denied in part, and the Clerk of the Court is instructed to maintain Defendant Doe #41's Supplement to the Motion to Proceed Anonymously [26-1] under seal at Restriction Level 2, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/12.(lygsl, )
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously, and denying without prejudice 17 Defendant J. Doe No. 22's Omnibus Motion to: (1) Sever Defendants for Improper Joinder, (2) Emergency Stay the Proceedings Based on Resolution of Misjoinder Issue, (3) to Quash the Subpoena, or in the Alternative, (4) for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/17/2012. (mehcd)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Quash filed by an unidentified Doe Defendant, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2012. (mehcd)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/03/12.(jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media v. John Does 1-42
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-42
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?