Burton v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Steve N. Burton
Defendant: Calvin Polland, USA, Charles Schoephoerster and Keith Baker
Case Number: 1:2012cv02002
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party Charles Schoephoerster (P.A.), Keith Baker (M.D.) and Calvin Polland (D.O.), with Prejudice. terminated. All parties shall bear their own attorneys fees andcosts, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/8/2013.(ervsl, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and the claims brought by Plaintiff pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act are hereby DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) for lack of jurisdiction. by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/18/2013.(ervsl, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2012. The court GRANTS 18 Motion to Stay. The court shall stay discovery until a ruling on the defendant's 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction has been entered. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 10/18/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/6/12. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Polland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schoephoerster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve N. Burton
Represented By: Julia Treacy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?