Banks v. Arapahoe County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Torrey V. Banks |
Defendant: |
Bendicroft, Gallegos, Arapahoe County Detention Center, Walcher, Erin, Knight, Sheila Clark and Kraus |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv02014 |
Filed: |
August 1, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Fremont |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. ORDERED that the motion to reconsider 53 is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the prisoner's motion and affidavit for leave to proceed on appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 52 is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/29/13.(sgrim)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing
45
JUDGMENT re: 44 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 2/22/13. (sgrim)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
40
MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Motion Requesting One Free Electric Copy of All Documents Filed Thus Far, and Motion Requesting Proof in Writing of My In Pauperis Status for Automatic Payments to Be Taken Out of My Account Monthly from CDOC, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/06/2013.(skl)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER Denying Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the second motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 33 is denied. The motion 35 seeking an extension of time in which to file an amended complaint is granted. The motion titled Notice of Appeal 32 which also seeks an extension of time in which to file an amended complaint is denied as moot. Mr. Banks will be allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to submit an amended complaint that complies with the order of November 8, 2012, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/11/13.(sgrim)
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing
30
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 28 Motion to Show Excusable Neglect, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/26/2012.(sks)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting Motion for Extention of Time. ORDERED that the portion of the combined motion titled "Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief" 23 is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of the combined motion titled and "Motion for an 'Extension' to Amend Complaint" 23 is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Banks will be allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to submit an amended complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/10/12.(sgrim, )
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing
22
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/12 DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion For Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff continues to have thirty (30) days from the order of November 8, 2012 (ECF No. 20), in which to file an amended complaint as directed. (nmmsl, )
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/08/2012. (skssl, )
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
18
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Time Extension to Cure Deficiencies; granting in part and denying in part 17 Declaration: Motion for Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/17/2012.(skssl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?