Carrillo, v. Hickenlooper, et al.,
Plaintiff: Alfonso A. Carrillo, Augustin Telles, Raymundo Castillo, Margarita Garcia, Sergio Hernandez, Gonzalo Perez, German Jasso Bruno, Laura Patricia Gutierrez-Vite, Jose Orozco, Sergio Sarmiento, Maria Sarmiento, Veronica Fernandez Beleta, Jose Leyva Caraveo, Maria Elena Carrillo, Ana L. Chavez, Daniel Ortiz, Jose Sarmiento, Juan Pablo Reyes, Sergio Ibarra, Maria Susana Ibarra, Teresa Monge, Rudy Breda, Jorge Ramirez, Martha Esquivel, Ruben Padilla, Luis Figueroa, Manuel Pacheco, Elva Mendoza, Javier Mendoza, Jose A. Urena-Santos, Jesus Sandoval, Mariam Burciaga, William Cristo Santos, Janet Valera, Juan Vasquez, Selvin Cardoza, Jessica Iturbe Jaime, Maria de los Angeles Araiza, Maria de Jesus Araiza, Ema Ortiz, Luis Carlos Espinoza-Lopez, Julio Arreguin, Avaro Nunez, Alejandro Araiza, Jose Castillo, Maria L. Solis, Nohelia Jimenez, Elizabeth Padilla, Ma. del Rosario Urena, Nora G. Gonzalez, Hugo A. Pacheco, Sonia Lopez, Adriana Padilla, Nancy Ramirez, Osbaldo Velez, Jorge Rubalcava Galindo, Beatriz Manriquez, Alejandro Garcia, Claudia Orozco Molina, Jose M. Velasquez and Juan De Dios Munoz Ganzalez
Defendant: John W. Hickenlooper, John W. Sutters, Elizabeth Oldham, Mitchell Morrissey, Don Quick, Carol Chambers, Rodney Johnson, Ted Mink, Frank Thomas, Sheriff Department, Douglas N. Darr and Tom Deland
Case Number: 1:2012cv02034
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MINUTE ORDER granting 441 Motion for Copies of Orders by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2015. It is ordered that the Clerk send a copy of the Order dated 10/06/2015 issued by Judge Raymond Moore. (mdave, )
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER denying 429 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/06/2015.(cthom, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting 356 Motion to Dismiss, granting 358 Motion to Dismiss, granting 361 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part 362 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, granting 363 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, adopting 381 Report and Recommendations as modified, denying 385 Motion to Strike, denying 412 Plaintiff's Brief, and denying 411 Plaintiff's Objection to Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff is denied leave to file an amended Complaint. Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/20/2015. (cpear)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MINUTE ORDER granting 413 Motion to Withdraw from Mailing List; granting 415 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Review of Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/15/2015. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Mr. Deland as a party to this case and from the mailing list. Defendant may file a response to the motion 411 on or before 7/31/2015. (mdave, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 218 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed in accordance with Judge Hegarty's Recommendation and Plaintiffs' are granted leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/14/2014.(trlee, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 308 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleadings as Statement of Related Cases or Case Association Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2013. (mehcd)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE ORDER granting 301 Defendant Deland's Motion to Accept Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Verified Amended Complaint Out of Time, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/2013. (mehcd)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER denying 277 Plaintiffs' Opposed Combined Motion for Removal from Stay, Opposed Motion for Clarification and for an Order Authorizing a Registry of the Recording of Plaintiffs' Claims. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/05/13. (alvsl)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: 271 Plaintiffs' Emergency Opposed Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiffs' Request for Ex Parte Interim, TRO/Preliminary Injunctive [sic], for a Three Judge Court Pursuant [to] 28 U.S.C. § 2284; and 273 Plaintiffs' Brief and Legal Grounds in Support of Request for Emergency Opposed Motion for Relief Requested. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/3/2013. (mehcd)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Discharging Order to Pay Filing Fee re: 266 Response filed by Alfonso A. Carrillo. Therefore, the June 4, 2013 order is discharged. There is no requirement that the Plaintiffs seek leave to proceed IFP in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/13. (alvsl)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO PAY FILING FEE: Plaintiffs shall pay the $350 filing fee or provide evidence they have already done so on or before 6/21/2013. Plaintiffs shall file a copy of a receipt demonstrating payment before the deadline. If Plaintiffs fail to comply with this order, the Court may recommend dismissal of the case as a sanction for Plaintiffs' refusal to comply with court orders and to prosecute this action in accordance with all applicable rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2013. (mehcd)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ORDER denying 248 Plaintiffs' Motion for Misjoinder of Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 or Alternate Order to Show Cause and Compliance with Direction to File Missing Affidavits. If the Plaintiffs seek to proceed in forma pauperi s in this case, they shall re-file the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis signed by all Plaintiffs and containing affidavits from all Plaintiffs on or before May 16, 2013; otherwise, they will be ordered to pay the filing fee of $350 in this case or provide evidence that they have already done so. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/2/2013. (mehcd)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Plaintiffs Emergency Motion and Brief for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relieff [sic], for Clarification and Forthwith In Person and Telephone Ex Parte or Alternative Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall not file another motion asking the Court to intervene in the ongoing state court proceedings, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/24/2013.(ervsl, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Combined Motion, Affidavits for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, for Approval of Electronic Filing via USDC Colorado ECF System filed April 12, 2013; docket # 234 is denied without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/15/2013.(ervsl, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER denying 191 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Reconsideration for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant [to] 42 U.S.C. § 3613(b)(1)(2), 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and for Stay of All Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2013.(ervsl, )
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 159 unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants John Hickenlooper and John Suthers Motion to Stay. A temporary stay of the proceedings is hereby imposed pending resolution of the motions to dismiss filed in this case. The Defendants shall file a status report within five (5) days of any order resolving their motions to dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2013.(ervsl, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying wiithout prejudice 182 Plaintiffs Unopposed Emergency Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant [to] 42 U.S.C. § 3613(b)(1)(2) and Stay of All Proceedings. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/23/2013.(ervsl, ) (Modified on 1/23/2013 added text that the motion is denied without prejudice)(ervsl, ).
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Amended Recommendation (ECF No. 72) is ADOPTED in its entirety; The following Plaintiffs are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to appear at the October 17, 2012 Status Conference, and for failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause dated October 18, 2012: Agustin Telles Sergio Sarmiento, Maria Sarmiento, Veronica Fernandez Beleta, Jose Leyva Caraveo,Jose Sarmiento, Sergio Ibarra, Maria Susana Ibarra, Rudy Breda, Elva Mendoza, Javier Mendoza, Jesus Sandoval , Mariam Burciaga, Juan Vasquez, Maria De Los Angeles Araiza, Maria De Jesus Araiza, Ema Ortiz, Luis Carlos Espinoza-Lopez, Alejandro Araiza, Jose Castillo, Juan De Dios Munoz Gonzalez, Maria Solis, Nancy Ramirez, Osbaldo Velez, Jorge Rubalcava Galindo, Beatriz Manriquez, Alejandro Garcia, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/2/2013.(ervsl, )
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 136 Defendants John Hickenlooper and John Suthers (State Defendants) Motion to Stay All Proceedings, for failure to comply with 10.1E., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/27/2012.(ervsl, )
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying Emergency 111 Motion for TRO for Reconsideration for Injunctive Relief Against State Criminal and Civil Proceedings Affecting Plaintiffs on this Action by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/13/2012.(ervsl, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER: 95 Defendants Mitch Morrisey and Carol Chambers' Motion for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleading Answer or Otherwise Respond is granted. Defendants Morrisey and Chambers shall file an answer on or before 12/24/2012. Defendants Morrisey and Chambers' 97 Amended Certificate of Service, filed as a "motion to amend," is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/5/2012. (mehcd)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER on Motion for Clarification. Before the Court is Plaintiff Alfonso Carrillos Unpossed1 Motion for an Order to Authorize Plaintiffs Law Library and Storage Privileges as Pro-Se Litigant filed November 29, 2012; docket # 81 . To the extent the motion seeks clarification that Mr. Carrillo currently proceeds in this case as a pro se Plaintiff, the record reveals that Mr. Carrillo is, indeed, currently proceeding in this matter without an attorney, and the motion is granted to provide such clarification. Otherwise, all other requests for relief are denied. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/3/2012.(ervsl, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying without prejudice 68 Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of State Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2012. (mehcd)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER 52 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, 53 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, and 54 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify are denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and 15. At this stage of the litigation, no Defendant has filed an answer or other response; therefore, the Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint naming additional parties without leave of court. However, the Amended Complaint must be signed by all Plaintiffs named in the action. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/15/12. (alvsl)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 46 The Notice to Amend Additional Plaintiffs; denying without prejudice 48 Notice to Amend Additional Plaintiffs Motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/13/2012.(ervsl, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: 3 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, 4 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and 8 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/4/2012. (mehcd)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. To the extent plaintiffs' 8 motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction seeks a temporary restraining order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b), it is denied. To the extent plaintiffs' 8 motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction seeks a preliminary injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), it is held in abeyance until the motion has been fully briefed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/9/12.(mnfsl, )
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. To the extent plaintiffs' 3 , 4 motions for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction seek a temporary restraining order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b), they are denied. To the extent plaintiffs' 3 , 4 motions for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction seek a preliminary injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), they are held in abeyance until the motions have been fully briefed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/6/12.(mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo, v. Hickenlooper, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso A. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustin Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Jasso Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Patricia Gutierrez-Vite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Sarmiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sarmiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Fernandez Beleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Leyva Caraveo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana L. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sarmiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Susana Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Breda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elva Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Urena-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Burciaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cristo Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Valera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selvin Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Iturbe Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de los Angeles Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de Jesus Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ema Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Carlos Espinoza-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Arreguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avaro Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria L. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nohelia Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma. del Rosario Urena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora G. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo A. Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osbaldo Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rubalcava Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Manriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Orozco Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan De Dios Munoz Ganzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Hickenlooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Sutters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Mink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Darr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Deland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?