Velasquez v. Faulk, et al
Petitioner: |
Juan Velasquez |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Faulk |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv02057 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Lincoln |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER re: 3 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Velasquez, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, ECF No. 6, is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that I sua sponte deny the issuance of a Certificate of Appealability pursuant to 28 U.S .C. § 2253(a). Having considered the standards of Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000), I find that Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right such that reasonable jurists could disagree as to the disposition of his petition. 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). It is FURTHER ORDERED that I also sua sponte certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order is not taken in good faith, and, therefore, in forma pauperis status will be denied for the purpose of appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). If Applicant files a notice of appeal he must also pay the full $505.00 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24., by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/5/2014. (evana, )
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
19
AMENDED Order to Provide State Court Record. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of this Order to the following:(1) Clerk of the Court Adams County District Court 1100 Judicial Drive Brighton, Colorado 80601; and (2) Court Services Manager State Court Administrators Office 101 W. Colfax, Ste. 500 Denver, Colorado 80202 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/06/13. (jjhsl, )
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and For Answer. ORDERED that within thirty days of the filing of an answer Applicant may file a reply if he desires. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of this Order by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/01/13. (jjhsl, )
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
13
ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/24/13. (nmmsl, )
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/5/12. (lygsl, )
|
August 13, 2012 |
Filing
4
ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/13/12. (nmmsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?