Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bridge Premium Finance, LLC (f/k/a Berjac of Colorado, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Bride Premium Finance, LLC, Michael J. Turnock and William P. Sullivan, ll
Case Number: 1:2012cv02131
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER CORRECTING TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS. 124 Motion for Order Correcting Typographical Errors is GRANTED. The Corrections to the Typographical Errors are APPROVED. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 4/13/2106.(agarc, )
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Approving Proposed Distribution Plan. Ordered that the Motion 121 is Granted. Ordered that the Distribution Plan is Approved. Recipients of the Distribution Plan shall have 30 days to object Signed. by Judge John L. Kane on 02/08/16.(jhawk, )
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER to Disburse Funds to Pay Fees and Expenses of Tax Administrator in reference to 118 MOTION for Costs to Pay Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by Judge John L. Kane on 02/02/2016.(cthom, )
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion to Disburse Funds to Pay Tax Penalties and Interest. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 09/29/15.(jhawk, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Order to Disburse Funds and Pay Tax Liabilities. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 06/23/15.(jhawk, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER to Disburse Funds to Pay Fees and Expenses of Tax Administrator re: 108 by Judge John L. Kane on 05/07/15.(jhawk, )
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that each side shall pay its own fees. The Securities and Exchange Commission shall have its costs awarded upon the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court within 14 days of entry of Judgment by Clerk on 10/30/14. (jhawk, )
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge John L. Kane on 09/19/14.(jhawk, )
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Directing Transfer of Funds Held in Attorney Trust Accounts to Distribution Fund re: 94 by Judge John L. Kane on 07/31/14.(jhawk, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss by Judge John L. Kane on 11/19/13.(jjhsl, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Party With Prejudice. Party Jane K. Turnock (Actually named as Relief Defendant) terminated by Judge John L. Kane on 06/18/13.(jjhsl, )
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Amended ORDER Granting 70 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Relating to Jane Turnock, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/14/13. (sgrim)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Specifying Disbursement of Funds Related to Jane Turnock re: 62 Stipulated Order of Settlement, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/12/13. (sgrim)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Final Judgment as to Michael J. Turnock re: 63 MOTION for Judgment, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/11/13. (sgrim)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Stipulated ORDER of Settlement as to Relief Defendant Jane K. Turnock re: 56 Motion for Order, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/8/13.(sgrim)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER for Submission of Amended Proposed Final Judgment. In light of the Answer submitted by Defendants Bridge Premium Finance, LLP and Mr. Turnock 60 and the Admissions contained therein, the pending Motion for Reconsideration 59 is held in abeyance and parties are directed to submit an amended proposed final judgment draft, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/7/13. (sgrim)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Entry of Final Judgments. The parties' Unopposed Motions to Enter Final Judgments 51 and 52 are DENIED, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/17/13.(sgrim)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Amending Preliminary Injunction, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/2/12. (sgrim)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re: settlement. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss due on or before 12/12/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/17/12. (bnbcd, )
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 10/12/2012. Denying 19 Motion for Order; Denying 20 Motion for Order. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. Order of reference shall go to Magistrate Judge Boland. Plaintiff shall contact ING regarding release of children's accounts. (babia)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits by Judge John L. Kane on 08/14/12. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bridge Premium Finance, LLC (f/k/a Berjac of Colorado, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bride Premium Finance, LLC
Represented By: Martin Melville Berliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Turnock
Represented By: Martin Melville Berliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Sullivan, ll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Thomas J. Krysa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?