Morris v. Opsahl et al
Plaintiff: Darwin Morris
Defendant: Nathan Opsahl and Board of County Commissioners for Summit County Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv02134
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/15/2014. (jsmit )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 3/25/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. 3/20/2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/2014. (rpmcd)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT by Clerk re 48 and 32 : the complaint in this action is dismissed as to the Sheriff of Summit County, Colorado. Defendant is awarded costs upon the filing of a bill of costs within 14 days, by Deputy Clerk on 2/21/2014. (rpmcd)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Sheriff of Summit County's Motion for Summary Judgment 32 , is granted and a written order will be prepared and entered.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Amend 13 : Discovery due by 9/20/2013 and Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/22/2013.(rpmcd )
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Modify 13 Scheduling Order: Plaintiff's expert disclosures due on or before June 21, 2013, Defendant expert witnesses are due on or before July 22, 2013 and rebuttal disclosures due on or before August 12, 2013. Discovery due by 8/22/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/6/2013.(rpmcd)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Modify re 13 : Plaintiff's expert disclosures due 3/31/2013, defendant's expert disclsoures due 7/1/2013 and rebuttal due 7/22/2013. Discovery due by 8/1/2013 and Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2013.(rpmcd )
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER re 18 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/30/2012. (rpmcd )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/31/2012 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 25, 2012, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/2012. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Opsahl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Morris
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Represented By: John R. Holland
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Opsahl
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Summit County Colorado
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?