2-BT, LLC v. Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group
Plaintiff: 2-BT, LLC
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv02167
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. The 43 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. PCIC's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The trial preparation conference scheduled for Monday, 10/21/2013 and trial scheduled for Tuesday, 11/5/2013 are vacated. This case is dismissed and defendant may have its costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/18/13.(mnfsl, )
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Four day Jury Trial set for 11/5/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/21/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/18/13. (mjgsl, )
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/11/2013. (klmcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2-BT, LLC v. Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Represented By: Amber Fayne Ju
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2-BT, LLC
Represented By: Bradley S. Freedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?