Hill et al v. Public Advocate of the United States
Plaintiff: Kristina Hill, Brian Edwards and Thomas Privitere
Defendant: Public Advocate of the United States
Case Number: 1:2012cv02550
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER that Public Advocates Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ECF No. 101 and NAGR, Rocky Mountain, ODell, Andrew Brown, and Dudley Browns Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint ECF No. 106 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motions are GRANTED to the extent that the First Amendment bars the Plaintiffs Colorado state law appropriation of name or likeness tort claim, and that claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motions are DENIED to the extent that Public Advocate and the Defendants seek dismissal of the Plaintiffs copyright infringement claim based on the fair use doctrine, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/31/2014.(evana, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/29/13.(jjhsl, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 53 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/08/13.(jjhsl, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/11/2012. (kmtcd)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/3/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Public Advocate of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Hill
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Christopher L. Larson
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Daralyn Jeannine Durie
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Edwards
Represented By: Daralyn Jeannine Durie
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Christopher L. Larson
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Privitere
Represented By: Daralyn Jeannine Durie
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Christopher L. Larson
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Advocate of the United States
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?