Harris v. Hoekstra
Plaintiff: Lionel Harris
Defendant: Gregory Lynn Hoekstra
Case Number: 1:2012cv02658
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE upon the Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice ECF No. 52 of the parties by their respective counsel of record, and the Court having examined the Stipulation, now finds that the dismissal should be granted. IT IS THEREFO RE ORDERED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay costs incurred, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/10/2014. (evana, ) (Main Document 53 replaced on 9/10/2014 with PDF Format) (evana, ). (Modified on 9/10/2014 attached PDF formatted document)(evana, ).
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2014. ORDERED: The court will allow Plaintiff's expert two weeks from today's date to prepare a report. To the extent Defendant's expert believes a supplemental report is necessary, he shall have two weeks from service of Plaintiff's report. The parties shall have until 5/31/2014 for counsel to depose each side's expert. ORDERED: 35 Defendant's Motion to Strike the Plaintiff's Retained Expert Stanley Gale is DENIED. 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Retained Expert is DENIED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER setting case for trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/26/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A five day Jury Trial is set to commence on 10/27/2014, 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/31/2014. (trlee, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 12/20/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 1/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/7/13. (rebsec, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 1/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/29/12. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hoekstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Harris
Represented By: Ronald William Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lynn Hoekstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?