Robinson v. Valerie Estrada, et al
Petitioner: James M. Robinson
Respondent: Valerie Estrada and Attorney General for the State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv02659
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 30 Motion for Relief From Judgment by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/2/15.(dkals, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on 29 Reply to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/9/15. (dkals, )
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Reinstate Habeas Corpus Proceeding by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/28/15. This action is dismissed without prejudice, and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied.(dkals, )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER overruling 22 Objection, and administratively closing the case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/16/13. (dkals, )
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Applicant file a response in keeping with this Order within thirtydays of the date of the Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Applicant fails to respond within the time allowed the Court will proceed with the only exhausted claim in this action, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 08/09/13. (nmmsl, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/21/13. ORDERED that Respondent Estrada brief the collateral consequences issue as set forth above within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Applicant desires he may respond to Respondent Estradas briefing within twenty-one days from the date Respondent Estrada submits a brief to this Court. (nmmsl, )
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/9/12. (bnbcd, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Valerie Estrada, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Valerie Estrada
Represented By: Melissa Meredith Drazen-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of Colorado
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?