October 26, 2015 |
Filing
247
ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/26/2015. (cthom, )
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
242
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 234 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/28/2015. Dismissal Papers due on or before 10/26/2015. ORDERED that the Trial Preparation Conference and the eight-day jury trial are VACATED. (slibi, )
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
231
ORDER granting 230 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims that were asserted against Defendant Valley View Hospital Association are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/15/2015. (athom, )
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
225
ORDER denying 174 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/5/2015. (emill)
|
April 1, 2015 |
Filing
208
MINUTE ORDER denying 196 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Sylver Brown, R.N., as a Witness at the April 2, 2015 Hearing ; denying 202 Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Kelly R. Glenn, D.O. as a Witness at the April 2, 2015 Hearing, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2015.(emill)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting 165 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendants Bruce D. Lippman, II, M.D. and Glenwood Medical Associates. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/2/2015.(tscha, )
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
163
ORDER resetting case for trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. An eight day Jury Trial is set to commence on 11/2/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore, in Courtroom A 601. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2015. (tscha, )
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
148
MINUTE ORDER; 145 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. Steven P. Johnston shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O. The Clerk is directed to remove Steven P. Johnston from electronic notification in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/23/14.(morti, )
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
117
ORDER regarding plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents pursuant to 96 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
103
MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the SupplementalDepositions of Brandi Cook, M.A. and Karen Gentry, R.N. and for Appropriate Sanctions Against Defendant Glenwood Medical Associates. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/9/2014.(klyon, )
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
88
ORDER setting case for trial: Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A fifteen day Jury Trial is to commence on 8/3/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore in Courtroom A 601. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/27/2014. (trlee, )
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting 80 Unopposed Motion to Temporarily Suspend Discovery and Authorizing Appointment of an Outside Mediator. Scheduling Order 27 is amended. Discovery due by 6/5/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/21/2014.(mjwcd)
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Brandi Cook, M.A.'s Personnel File from Defendant, Glenwood Medical Associates, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2013.(mjwcd)
|
November 6, 2013 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting 57 Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Granting 60 Bruce D. Lippman, II, M.D. and Glennwood Medical Associates' Joinder in Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Mot ion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Granting 62 Valley View Hospital Association's Joinder in Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Motions granted as outlined in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/6/2013.(mjwcd)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
66
MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Supplemental Deposition of Defendant, Bruce D. Lippman, M.D. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/21/2013.(mjwcd)
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing
53
MINUTE ORDER Granting 51 Valley View Hospital Association's Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order RE: Personnel File. Withdrawing 46 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion for Protective Order RE: Personnel File. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/3/2013.(mjwcd)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing
45
MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Second Stipulated Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Witness Deadlines. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 27 ) is amended to extend Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline up to and includi ng September 30, 2013, Defendant's expert disclosure deadline up to and including November 11, 2013, and the parties' rebuttal designations deadline up to and including December 11, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/23/13. (alvsl)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
37
MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Witness Deadline. Scheduling Order 27 is amended, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/10/2013.(mjwcd)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/1/2012. (mjwcd)
|