Selhime v. Carlson et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Selhime
Defendant: Danny England, Royal Havens, Susan M. Tiona, Mary Grieb, Mark Wienphal, Nova Walker, Eric C. Carlson, Jacob F. Patterson, Jody Buffmack, St. Thomas More Hospital and K. K.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02876
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER affirming and adopting 74 Report and Recommendation;granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. Complaint DIMISSED against all defendants. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/19/14.(rbjcd, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Second ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court, where appropriate, shall attempt to obtain a waiver of service from Defendant Susan M. Tiona at Kit Carson Correctional Center, P.O. Box 2000, Bur lington, CO 81807, the address filed with the court by the CDOC on March 7, 2013. (See Doc. # 24 ). If a waiver of service cannot be obtained by the Clerk, the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint (Doc. # 20 ) and sum mons upon Defendant Tiona. Where appropriate, the Marshal shall first attempt to obtain a waiver of service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. It is FURTHER ORDERED that after service of process, Defendant Tiona shall respond to the Amended Complaint as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/11/13. (alvsl)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/01/2013. (skl)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying as unnecessary 18 Motion for Permission to File Only a Copy of His Amended Complaint to the Court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/07/2013.(skl)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selhime v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Tiona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Grieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wienphal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob F. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Buffmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Thomas More Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Selhime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?