EFCO Corporation v. Western Surety Company, et al.,
Plaintiff: EFCO Corporation
Defendant: Western Surety Company, Tower I Construction Company, Colorado Commercial Glass, Inc. and Gregory J. Evans
Case Number: 1:2012cv02934
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. The above-captioned action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay its own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/23/2015. (alowe)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Striking Without Prejudice 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; stri king 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is granted leave to refile a single motion for summary judgment in compliance with both this Districts Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1E, and also with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.E, on or before November 26, 2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/12/2013.(ervsl, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 58 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Leave to Respond to Requests for Discovery and Motion to Withdraw or Amend Deemed Admissions. Western shall supplement its responses with an affidavit executed either by an authorized represent ative of Western or by Mr. Ekstrom affirming his authority to sign the responses as an authorized representative by 10/24/2013. Any failure by Western to comply with this order may result in sanctions against it. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/17/2013. (mehcd)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 54 Defendants Western Surety Company and Tower 1 Construction Company, Motion for leave to respond to Plaintiff, EFCO Corporation's ("EFCO"), discovery requests, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/26/2013.(ervsl, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Caption. The caption in this matter to reflect that United States of America is no longer a participating Plaintiff for the use of EFCO Corporation, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/21/2013.(ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EFCO Corporation v. Western Surety Company, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower I Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Commercial Glass, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFCO Corporation
Represented By: Kevin R. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?