Telke v. New Frontier Media, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Telke
Defendant: New Frontier Media, Inc., Alan Isaacman, Melissa Hubbard, Hiram J. Woo, Walter Timoshenko, LFP Broadcasting, LLC and Flynt Broadcast, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02941
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge John L. Kane on 8/25/2015. (babia)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice to the Class 63 . Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 05/18/15.(jhawk, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Modify Stipulated Scheduling and Discovery Order by Judge John L. Kane on 09/15/14.(jhawk, )
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Judge John L. Kane on 08/19/13.(jjhsl, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 11/27/2012. Granting in Part and Denying in Part 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Tamara Hoffschildt. (babia)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Concerning November 27, 2012 Hearing re: 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 10 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/21/12. (sgrim) Modified on 11/21/2012 to create document link. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telke v. New Frontier Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Telke
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Frontier Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Isaacman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiram J. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Timoshenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LFP Broadcasting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flynt Broadcast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?