Galbreath v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Joseph Galbreath
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2012cv02959
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to 22 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/27/13. (alvsl)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on September 23, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for September 9, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/12/2013. (rbjsec. )
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 2/8/2013. By noon on February 12, 2013, Mr. Lico shall either file his motion or provide Mr. Larson with the information requested. The cour t GRANTS 14 Motion for Protective Order. Discovery due by 5/8/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The court informs the parties to put together a conference call to Judge Jackson's chambers (303.844.4694) on Monday, February 11, 2013 in order to obtain trial dates. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/27/12. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galbreath v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Galbreath
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?