Hampton et al v. State of Colorado, The et al
Plaintiff: |
Nathaniel Hampton and Jeff Spicola |
Defendant: |
State of Colorado, The, Barney Iuppa and Lira Sims |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv02989 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Delta |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation and Order of United States Magistrate Judge 44 is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that defendants Motion to Dismiss 22 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion for Relief from Order 12 is DENIED. ORDERED that this case shall be DISMISSED and closed in its entirety by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/26/14.(jhawk, )
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER. Mr. Hampton's 37 Combined Motion to Strike and to Amend is granted. The Second Amended Prisoner Complaint (Doc. # 37-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Defendant may stand on her 22 Motion to Dismiss filed on 4/4/2013 or may file a new motion to dismiss on or before Wednesday, 7/10/2013. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/18/13.(mnfsl, )
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
34
Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/15/13. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 25 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER to Dimiss in Part and to Assign in Part to a District Judge and a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants State of Colorado and Judge Barney Iuppa are dismissed as improper parties to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint as as serted against Defendant Lira Sims shall be assigned to District Judge Phillip A. Brimmer, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to the Amended Prisoner Complaint filed on December 2, 2012, the Motion to Withdraw, 5 is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/29/13.(sgrim)
|
December 2, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/12 GRANTING 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and DENYING as unnecessary 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the tendered Amended Complaint, ECF No. 6 at Attach. 1.(nmmsl, )
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
4
ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/15/12. (nmmsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?