McDonald v. Wise et al

Plaintiff: Wayne McDonald
Defendant: Lesli Branch Wise, Amber Miller, Michael Hancock, City and County of Denver, Lesli (I) Branch Wise, Amber (I) Miller and Michael (I) Hancock
Case Number: 1:2012cv02996
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Ordered that the Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings 88 , for Summary Judgment 92 , and to Strike Deposition Changes 110 are all DENIED. Within the next two weeks or on or before March 9, 2016 the parties shall CONFER and call in jointly to chambers to set this matter for Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 02/29/16.(jhawk, )
July 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 36 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 07/01/13.(jjhsl, )
May 23, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that Defendant Wise's Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED, the claim of defamation against her DISMISSED, and Defendant Wise is DISMISSED from the lawsuit. ORDERED that, as Plaintiff McDonald fails to state a cognizable cl aim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 14 is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims, against each and every Defendant however named, are DISMISSED in their entirety. Accordingly, final judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff; and the defendants are AWARDED their costs, by Clerk on 5/23/13. (lygsl, )
May 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs claims, against each and every Defendant however named, are DISMISSED in their entirety, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/13/2013.(ervsl, )
May 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss - Leslie Branch Wise. I GRANT Defendant Wises Motion 17 and ORDER the claim of defamation against her DISMISSED. Because it is the only claim Plaintiff asserts against her, Defendant Wise is also DISMISSED from the lawsuit, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/1/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Wise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne McDonald
Represented By: Anne Thomas Sulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesli Branch Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesli (I) Branch Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber (I) Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?