Leck v. Financial Planning Association

Plaintiff: Amy Leck
Defendant: Financial Planning Association
Case Number: 1:2012cv03031
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/22/13. (msksec, )
March 13, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/13/13. (bnbcd, )
April 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is 6/17/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/10/13.(bnbcd, )
December 6, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/2012. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leck v. Financial Planning Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Leck
Represented By: Kimberlie K. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Planning Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.