Gocha v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Richard L. Gocha
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv03143
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting 47 Report and Recommendations, overruling 51 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. FURTHER, given this Court's earlier dismissal of Claim III, this entire matter is now dismissed and Defendant is awarded costs. Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file a bill of costs which shall be taxed by the Clerk of the Court. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/12/2014.(tscha, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action Against National Railroad Passenger Corporation re: 52 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Race Dis crimination pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1981 against Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation is dismissed with prejudice; and Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. This dismissal shall not result in any party being deemed a prevailing party for purposes of this litigation. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/26/13. (alvsl)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Vacating Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. The Trial Preparation Conference set for March 7, 2014 before Judge Raymond P. Moore is VACATED. FURTHER the 5-day Jury Trial set for March 31, 2014 before Judge Raymond P. Moore is hereby VACATED and will be reset after the Final Pretrial Conference. Judge Craig B. Shaffer's Chambers will set the Final Pretrial Conference. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/11/13. (alvsl)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/17/2013. (cbssec)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2013 taking under advisement 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. FTR: C. Covington - Courtroom A402. (ccovi)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on March 31, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/05/2013. (rbjsec. )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/4/2012. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gocha v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Gocha
Represented By: Jennifer C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Ross Harlan Friedman
Represented By: Emily Anne Glunz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?