Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Broom et al
Plaintiff: |
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation |
Defendant: |
Terrance G. Broom, B&B Appraisal, Inc., Joseph S. Pace and JSP Properties and Appraisal |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv03145 |
Filed: |
December 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael E. Hegarty |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
124
ORDER. ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, with each party to bear its or his own attorneys fees and costs. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreements between the parties by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/18/14. (jhawk, )
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER. ORDERED that the Pace defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement 78 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation on Motion to Enforce Settlement 112 is SUSTAINED. ORDERED t hat the Amended Recommendation of Magistrate Judge 111 is OVERRULED. ORDERED that, on or before September 8, 2014, the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to paragraph five of the Material Terms by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/28/14.(jhawk, )
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing
108
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2014, taking under advisement 78 Motion to Enforce Settlement. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing
84
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2014, taking under advisement 78 Motion to Enforce Settlement. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
62
MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Extend the Cut-Off Date to Take the Deposition of Plaintiff. Discovery due by 1/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/2014. (mehcd)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER denying as moot 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Expenses Incurred Regarding Defendant's [sic] Motion to Compel, and denying 53 Defendants B&B Appraisal, Inc. and Terrance Broom's Combined Motion to Reconsider September 6, 2013 Order and Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Expenses Incurred Regarding Defendant's [sic] Motion to Compel. The B&B Defendants shall pay Plaintiff's counsel $2,832.32 within 30 days of the date of this order. Counsel for the B&B Defendants shall file a Notice of Compliance with this order within three (3) days of payment. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/2013. (mehcd)
|
September 5, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/5/2013. (mehcd)
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
45
PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/12/13. (mnfsl, )
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
44
ORDER. Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Entry of Protective Order is granted as specified herein and the request for sanctions is denied. Plaintiff shall modify its proposed order in accordance with this order and submit the modified order to the Court via email on or before 7/10/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/8/13.(mnfsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?