Ironstone Condominiums Association at Stroh Ranch Owners Association, Inc. v. Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ironstone Condominiums Association at Stroh Ranch Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv03160
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/12/2014. (athom, )
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 111 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/03/2014. (athom, )
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion In Limine/For Sanctions Due to Plaintiffs Spoliation of Evidence 107 is DENIED, for reasons stated on record. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Re Videos Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37 102 is GRANTED. Defendant and Defendant's experts are permitted to observe the windows and glazing beads contained on building 16 and 17, in particular those pictured in t he exhibits attached to Plaintiff's motion 102 . Counsel should meet and confer on an appropriate date for the inspection. Plaintiff's representative will be allowed to accompany Defendant's group, however should maintain reasonable separation to allow Defendant and its experts to converse without being overheard. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 112 Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena To Produce Additional Documents And Notice Of Records Deposition Set For March 28, 2014, and granting in part 114 Motion for Protective Order Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(C) Re: Records Deposition Of Chips Roofing, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/28/14.(dkals, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Re: Additional Deposition of Ken Smith, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/7/14.(sgrim)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Disclosure of Alleged Privileged Documents from Defendant. The Defendant shall produce the redacted documents as more specifically described herein to the Plaintiff on or before December 18, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/12/13.(sgrim)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/25/13.(sgrim)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motions Hearing held on 10/24/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37 34 is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Defendant is directed to produce the underwriting f iles, by electronic media, on or before November 1, 2013 for in camera review. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) and for Protective Orders and Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 26(c) Re: Discovery Deposition Abuse by the De fendant 39 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Modify or Clarify Scheduling Order Re: Limitation on Number of Retained Experts 48 is GRANTED IN PART. In light of the parties' stipulation, the discovery deadlines are extended as follo ws: Discovery cut off: February 24, 2014. Dispositive motions: March 24, 2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and RESET as a Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference for May 13, 2014 at 9:45 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference cal l and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than seven (7) days before the final pretrial conference. Plaintiff 's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Re: Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadline to Permit Supplement to Report of Blane Clark 56 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Re: An Enlargement of Time to Endorse its Experts 59 is DENIED AS MOOT. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Preclude William McLoughlin, Any Employee or Representative of Plaintiff and Public Adjusters of Colorado, LLC, and Any Expert Endorsed by Plaintiff from Supervising, Attending, or Otherwise Participating in Any Manner With Peerlesss Retained Experts Inspection of the Property And Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing 37 is GRANTED, as stated on record. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/9/13. (sgrim)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 12/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 4/7/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/1/13.(dkals, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/25/2013. (kmtcd)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/28/2013. (kmtcd)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/18/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ironstone Condominiums Association at Stroh Ranch Owners Association, Inc. v. Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironstone Condominiums Association at Stroh Ranch Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Madison Stuart Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Lyndsay K. Arundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?