Cunningham v. Bank of America N.A.

Plaintiff: Bobbie D Cunningham
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03316
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Referring Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 4:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/4/2013. (klyon, )
March 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING THE TIMING OF A MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/10/2012. (ggall, )
March 15, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/15/13. (msksec, )
June 6, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 26 Order. By Clerk on 6/6/13. (mnfsl, )
January 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference on 3/12/2013 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 323 before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie D Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.