Burdic et al v. The Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson Co.
Plaintiff: Michael Taplin, Elizabeth Gard, Adam Donahue, Valarie Valdez, Micheal Struckhoff, Carolyn Burdic, Julianne Shoun, Mathew Smith, Anthony Scott and Kimberly Scott
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County, Colorado, The and Ted Mink
Case Number: 1:2012cv03362
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Final Judgment. ORDERED that Defendants shall have their costs with the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen (14) days of entry of judgment, and pursuant to the procedures set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 01/13/14. (jjhsl, )
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response toDefendants Motion to Dismiss by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/22/13.(jjhsl, )
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/02/13.(jjhsl, )
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/26/13.(jjhsl, )
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Limited Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/13/13.(jjhsl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/07/13.(jjhsl, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/11/13. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdic et al v. The Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Taplin
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Gard
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Donahue
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Valdez
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Struckhoff
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Burdic
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Shoun
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Smith
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Scott
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Scott
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Represented By: Mathew S. Shechter
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County, Colorado, The
Represented By: Patricia Wonsiewicz Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Mink
Represented By: Patricia Wonsiewicz Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?