Calvin v. SMG Corporation
Plaintiff: Christy Calvin
Defendant: SMG
Case Number: 1:2013cv00067
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 50 Report and Recommendations, overruling 52 Objection, and granting 15 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/29/14. This case is dismissed with prejudice. (dkals, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Jury Demand be granted, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/10/14. (dkals, )
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 35 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Concerning Proposed Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/13 is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/31/13.(bnbcd, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/19/13.(bnbcd, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/29/13. (dkals, )
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/18/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin v. SMG Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Calvin
Represented By: Reid Jason Elkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?