National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Intrawest ULC et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Intrawest ULC, Federal Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford and Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00079
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 801 National Union's Motion for Review Taxation of Costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/19/2017. Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA is awarded costs in the amount of $168,998.24 (sphil, )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 688 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2016 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant Federal Insurance Company's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Against National Union and Rory K. OFarrell 614 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED AND PART, consistent with the discussion held in Court. Plaintiff National Union's Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses from Federal Insurance Company 661 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED AND PART, consistent with the discussion held in Court. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Order. ORDERED that Federal and Continental's Motion to Renew Joinders in Intrawest's Motion for Summary Judgment 523 and Motion to Revive Same 640 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/15/16.(jhawk, )
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 610 COURTROOM MINUTES for Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Motion to Compel a Second Deposition of James P . Schratz and Production of Improperly Withheld Documents 569 is DENIED, for reasons stated on record. Intrawest's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and For Protective Order 576 is GRANTED. Defendant Federal is permitted to file its motion regarding Mr. OFarrell's failure to comply with its subpoena on or before December 4, 2015. A response to the motion shall be filed on or before December 14, 2015. Any replies shall be filed on or before December 18, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER; The Clerk of Court is directed to release documents numbered 486 487 488 489 490 491 and 492 from restriction Level 3 and instead place and hold the documents under restriction Level 1, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/15. (morti, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/2015. Granting for the reasons stated on the record 501 Defendants' Motion to Quash and for a Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(c)(1)(A) Preventing the Deposition of Geoffrey Hall. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (ebuch)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER denying 483 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Motion to Stay the June 25, 2015 Order Granting Intrawest ULC's Motion to Compel the Second Deposition of Christopher Weir, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/8/15.(sgrim)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.s Second Motion to Compel Documents from Federal Insurance Company 429 as it pertains to the Global Large Loss Notices and Case Evaluation Reports reviewed in camera is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth herein, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/15. (morti, )
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant Federal Insurance Company is directed to produce documentation with respect to the defense reserves to Plaintiff, as discussed , on or before August 18, 2015. Defendant Federal Insurance Company is directed to file documents pertaining to the case evaluation reports and large loss notices for in camera review, restricted level 3, on or before August 14, 2015. Plaintiff is directed to file a response regarding the case law referenced at today's hearing and relevant to the in camera review on or before August 17, 2015. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Second Motion to Compel Docum ents from Federal Insurance Company 429 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as stated on record. The single issue of potential production of case evaluation reports and large loss notices is taken under advisement and a written Order will is sue after in camera review. Defendants', Intervenors', and Third Party Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order 427 is GRANTED. The deadlines are extended as follows: Affirmative expert disclosure deadline: Augus t 31, 2015; Rebuttal expert disclosure deadline: September 30, 2015; Expert discovery cut-off: October 15, 2015, for the limited scope of deposing experts that file a report. All other dates remain as previously scheduled, including the fact discovery cut off of September 30, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting 450 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/29/15.(sgrim)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting 416 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s, Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/17/15.(sgrim)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motions Hearing held on 6/23/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's Motion to Compel Depositions of Intrawest Witnesses Karen Bradley and Barr on Weinstein 335 is DENIED. Intrawest ULC, F/K/A Intrawest Corporation's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Intrawest's Counsel 367 is GRANTED. Intrawest ULC's Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Ci v. P. 26(b)(5)(B) 347 is GRANTED. Intrawest ULC's Motion to Restrict Access to Various Exhibits Attached to Intrawest's Motion for a Protective Order and National Union's Motion to Compel 350 is GRANTED. Exhibit B to Document 3 47 shall be held under Restriction Level 2. Exhibit C to Document 347 shall be held under Restriction Level 1. Exhibit I to Document 335 shall be held under Restriction Level 3. National Union's Motion to Compel Intrawest to Produce Karen Bra dley's Communications and Memorandum of Law in Support 363 is DENIED. Intrawest is, however, ORDERED to search for and produce communications authored by or copied to Karen Bradley that are not privileged. Intrawest ULC's Motion to Res trict Access to a Privileged Document 398 is GRANTED. Motion to Compel Deposition of National Union's Witness, Christopher Weir, In His Individual Capacity 353 is GRANTED. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's Mot ion for Protective Order Regarding Second Deposition of Christopher Weir 354 is DENIED. Intrawest shall provide the identity of their Rule 30(b)(6) deponents to National Union on or before July 6, 2015. National Union shall provide deposition dates to Intrawest on or before July 6, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/11/2015. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA.'s Motion to Compel Outstanding Depositions of Intrawest # 310 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED I N PART. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA.'s Motion to Extend the Scheduling Order # 313 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Discovery deadline set September 30, 2015. Dispositive motion deadline set October 30, 2015 . National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's Motion to Amend the May 7, 2013 Scheduling Order to Permit Additional Interrogatories, Document Requests, and Requests to Admit # 315 is GRANTED. A Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/9/2015 4:00 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. FTR: KMT Courtroom C201. (lgale, )
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER denying 231 Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Intervenors' Bad Faith Claims, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/20/2015.(agarc, )
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order 279 is denied as MOOT. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Motion for Protective Order Regarding Intrawest ULCs Supplemental Request for Production 285 is DENIED. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Motion to Compel Federal Insurance Companys Responses to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Supporting Memoramdum (sic) of Law 281 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s Motion to Compel Third-Party Defendant Willis Entiti es' Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents and Memorandum of Law in Support 282 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Protective Order 277 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support 84 is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that Defendant Federal's Opposed Renewed Motion Pursuant to Rule 56(d) 144 is DENIED as moot. ORDERED that National Unions Motion to Strike Federal's Renewed Rule 56(d) Motion 154 is DENIED as moot by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/25/14.(jhawk, )
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/8/14. (sgrim)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/14/14.(jhawk, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/2014. The Court GRANTS 112 Motion to Continue; GRANTS IN PART 124 Motion to Compel; DENIES 146 Motion to Stay; DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE 176 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 181 Motion for Protective Order; DENIES 201 Motion to Stay. Discovery due by 4/30/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2015. FTR: KMT Courtroom C201. (lag)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 AMENDED ORDER granting 51 Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24. The Clerk shall file the Complaint in Intervention Against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Doc. No. 51-1), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/18/14. (sgrim) Modified on 2/18/2014 to indicate signature date on document was amended pursuant to chambers instructions. (sgrim)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Engelberth Construction, Inc.'s 45 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/12/2014.(klyon, )
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER denying 147 Motion to Strike CNA's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/4/13.(mnfsl, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Intrawest, ULC's Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint 79 and Defendant Intrawests ULC's Motion for Leave to Amend 80 are GRANTED. Defendant Intrawest ULC shall file its Third Party Complaint and its Counterclaim no later than November 19, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/15/13.(sgrim)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 81 Defendant Federal Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Defendant Federal Insurance Company shall file its Amended Answer in Opposition to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Counterclaims for Reimbursement no later than 10/7/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/2/13.(mnfsl, )
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/15/2013. (kmtcd)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/23/2013. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Intrawest ULC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Douglas Adam Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrawest ULC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?