Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00088
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/05/2014. (athom, )
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Stay. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/22/2014. (athom, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 104 Clerk's Judgment. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/6/2014. (shart)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINAL JUDGMENT 103 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/2/2014. (shart) Main Document 104 replaced on 5/2/2014 due to formatting issue. (shart).
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying as moot 51 Motion to Exclude, granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 86 Motion for Leave, denying 88 Motion to Strike, granting 99 Motion for Leave, and denying as moot 102 Motion for Order. Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial are vacated. This case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/30/2014. (athom, )
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2013. (mehcd)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/26/2013. (mehcd) Modified on 7/26/2013 to correct text (mehcd).
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/13.(dkals, )
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Enforce Compliance with Court Order and To Transfer Venue by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/21/13.(dkals, )
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/28/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/22/13. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?