Carnes v. Comcast of Colorado, IX, LLC

Plaintiff: Lisa Carnes
Defendant: Comcast of Colorado, IX, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00112
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [# 36 ] is APPROVED. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set1/10/2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 1/27/2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/2013. (klyon, )
May 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/17/13. (sgrim)
April 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/10/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 1/27/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/13. (rebsec, )
January 23, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/23/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnes v. Comcast of Colorado, IX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Carnes
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Colorado, IX, LLC
Represented By: Darin L. Mackender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?