Fisher v. Clements et al

Petitioner: Michael J. Fisher
Respondent: Tom Clements, John Davis and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2013cv00146
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of John Davis, John Suthers, Tom Clements against Michael J. Fisher re: 36 Order Dismissing Case, By Clerk on 8/26/15. (kfinn)
July 27, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Supplement State Court Record. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/27/2015. (mlace, )
September 4, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case; This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/4/14. (morti, )
August 29, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/29/14. (dkals, )
March 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the habeas corpus application 1 ) is denied and the action is dismissed. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/13. (sgrim)
January 24, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael J. Fisher
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Clements
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Davis
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?