September 9, 2014 |
Filing
193
ORDER approving parties' settlement agreement and dismissing the case with prejudice, re: 192 Motion for Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/9/2014.(trlee, )
|
May 22, 2014 |
Filing
179
MINUTE ORDER granting 175 Motion to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Enlargement of Time in Scheduling Order and to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/22/2014. (trlee, )
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
177
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing / Status Conference held on 5/20/2014. Granting 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time in Scheduling Order. Scheduli ng Order 23 is amended. Discovery due by 8/4/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2014. Final Pretrial Conference 8/12/2014 10:30 AM is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/5/2014 0 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Denying as moot, without prejudice, 155 Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion for Contempt. Withdrawing without prejudice 152 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Time Warner NY Cable, LLC Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [sic] 26 and F.R.C.P. [sic] 37. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing
169
MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 131 Motion to Enforce Settlement or, Alternatively, for an Evidentiary Hearing, and vacating the Evidentiary Hearing, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/13/14. 161 Motion for Enlargement of Time in Scheduling Or der and to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing is denied as moot in part. 166 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions of Nathan Chapman and Paul Sherman is granted, and 162 Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions of Nathan Chapman and Paul Sherman is withdrawn. 167 Motion for Status Conference is granted, and a Status Conference and Motion Hearing is set for 5/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (dkals, )
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
150
ORDER denying 135 Motion to Quash; granting 136 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/15/2014.(trlee, )
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
140
MINUTE ORDER Reserving ruling at this time on 135 The Harman Firm P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena. On or before 4/15/2014, The Harman Firm P.C. shall file with the court at restricted access Level 2 and consistent with D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 those documents requested in the subject subpoena for in camera review by this court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/7/2014.(emill)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
134
ORDER: Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion to Enforce Settlement or, Alternatively, for an Evidentiary Hearing, and Memorandum of Law in Support (docket no. 131 ) is set for an evidentiary hearing before MagistrateJudge Watanabe on May 20, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-502, Fifth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/13/2014. (klyon, )
|
February 11, 2014 |
Filing
129
ORDER Granting 87 Notice (Motion)Withdrawing Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint and/or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand 45 , filed by Time Warner NY Cable LLC ; Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal 45 is withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2014. (mjwcd)
|
November 27, 2013 |
Filing
106
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 104 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/27/2013.(mjwcd)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER Regarding Attorney Fees and Costs 58 and 95 . ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay to the Defendant the sum of $2,500.00 in reasonable and necessary attorney fees for having to prepare, file, and attend a hearing on Defendant's Mot ion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fee (docket no. 58), a Reply (docket no. 78) and a Supplement (docket no. 90). Payment of the $2,500.00 shall be made on or before November 29, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/04/13. (jjhsl, )
|
October 11, 2013 |
Filing
94
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2013, granting in part and denying in part 58 Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fees, and granting 85 Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2014. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/14/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-502. (mehcd)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to File a Second Amended Complaint (docket no. 73 ) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Walker G. Harman, Jr. Filed in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fee (docket no. 79 ) is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/25/13. (alvsl)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
69
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 8/13/2013. Plaintiff's Oral Motions to withdraw motions is granted; withdrawing 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Certif ication Order: Class Action Certification (F.R.C.P. [Sic] 23) and Withdrawing 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Provide Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [Sic] 37(a)(4). Plaintiff shall have up to and including 8/27/2013 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel and For Attorneys' Fees 58 . Deadline for Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint 8/27/2013. Court will address 45 Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal...when it decides the motion to file an amende d complaint. Scheduling Order 23 amended to extend discovery deadline for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of plaintiff, Patrick Hartley on 9/3/2013; Discovery due by 9/3/2013. Denying 63 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Notice to the Court and Motion to Continue Filed July 8, 2013 Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
37
MINUTE ORDER: Denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion and Request for Emergency Hearing Re: Spoliation of Evidence. Denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Pleadings and Motion for Summary Judgement. Plaintiff's tendered Revised: Complaint and Jury Demand 35 is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/16/2013.(mjwcd)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing
32
PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/13. (mnfsl, )
|
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
14
MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Ammend [sic] Caption/Defendant. The tendered amended complaint (Docket No. 10-1) is accepted for filing. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/13.(mnfsl, )
|