Cellport Systems, Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00175
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/9/2013.(trlee, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Joint Request to Extend Stay of All Deadlines Through December 16, 2013 by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/03/13.(jjhsl, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting joint request to stay all deadlines through 12/2/2013, re: 66 Notice of Settlement filed by Cellport Systems, Inc.. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/24/2013. (trlee, )
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/19/2013. (rbjsec. )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case. This action is TRANSFERRED to Judge Jackson. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/17/13.(mjgsl, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 02/12/13. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellport Systems, Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Compton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Prebeg
Represented By: David M. Tenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?