Scribner et al v. Areios Western Slope of Colorado, LLC et al

Defendant: Areios Western Slope of Colorado, LLC, Jett, LLC and Jeff Lathrop
Plaintiff: Brittany Scribner and Kami Swenson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00220
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000a Title II Civil Rights Act 1964
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/2/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 5/19/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/29/13. (rebsec, ) Modified on 4/29/2013 to correct date to match text (mnfsl, ).
July 11, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/11/2013. (klyon, )
October 15, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Compel.The Court DENIES the motion to compel (document #39) without prejudice;The Court DENIES the cross motion for protective order (document #42) without prejudice;The Court reserves ruling as to costs and attorneys fees under F.R.C.P. 37(a)(5)(A) consistent with the attached Order. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/15/2013.(ggall, )
October 28, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 46 Stipulated Motion for Court-Ordered Settlement Conference. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/28/2013.(klyon, )
December 17, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice [# 53 ] is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set 5/2/2014, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 5/19/2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scribner et al v. Areios Western Slope of Colorado, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Areios Western Slope of Colorado, LLC
Represented By: David Michael Dodero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jett, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Scribner
Represented By: Erik Richard Groves
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kami Swenson
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Represented By: Erik Richard Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.