Winmark Corporation v. Schneeberger et al
Plaintiff: Winmark Corporation
Defendant: Todd A. Schneeberger and Patricia A. Schneeberger
Case Number: 1:2013cv00274
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER In view of the order Doc. # 52 of the district judge administratively closing the action, IT IS ORDERED that the requirement contained in my order Doc. # 53 that the plaintiff file a status report is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/3/2014. (evana, )
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STRIKING 47 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Todd A. Schneeberger, Patricia A. Schneeberger. Defendants are GRANTED an extension of time to file an Answer to the Complaint or other Responsive Pleading. Such pleading must be filed on or before December 13, 2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/5/2013. (ervsl, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 38 Defendants Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default and the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants ECF No. 34 is VACATED; and Defendants shall file an Answer or Responsive Pleading on or before December 5, 2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/14/2013.(ervsl, )
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Defendants Motion ECF No. 36 is DENIED as moot; Defendants Motions ECF Nos. 38 and 41 are CONSOLIDATED as one motion and construed together as a Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, to be carried forward in the docket of this Court a s ECF No. 38 ; Given the consolidation of these motions, the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE ECF No. 41 ; Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment ECF No. 37 is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Response to Defendants Consolidated Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment by no later than November 8,2013. No reply will be permitted, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/31/2013.(ervsl, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Defendants are ORDERED to immediately cease and desist from using Plaintiffs Marks both inside and outside Defendants Store, consistent with the terms of this Order; If Defendants Sto re has not closed on or before April 15, 2013, the parties are DIRECTED to provide the Court with a Status Report regarding the status of Defendants Store at that time. This Status Report is to be filed no later than April 17, 2013 (and may include p hotographs from Defendants' store and receipts from same); and The Court GRANTS leave to Plaintiff to refile, if necessary and appropriate, any renewed motion for preliminary injunction on any argument (or evidence) that has not been addressed in this Order on or after April 16, 2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/19/2013.(ervsl, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The parties are directed to confer in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (f) on or before 03/21/13; The parties shall comply with the mandatory disclosure requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) on or before 04/04/13; Proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before 04/04/13; Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/12/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winmark Corporation v. Schneeberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winmark Corporation
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Patrick Compton
Represented By: Karla Marie Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd A. Schneeberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Schneeberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?