Advanced Career Technologies, Inc. v. John Does 1-10

Plaintiff: Advanced Career Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2013cv00304
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Unfair Competition (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Defendant Daniel Drasin's 53 Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Advanced Career Technologies, Inc.s Corporate Representative in Aid of Enforcement is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 15, 2015, counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Daniel Drasin shall jointly call Chambers at 303-335-2770 in order to set a Rule 69 Judgment Debtor examination at mutually-convenient date and time, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/15.(morti, )
April 24, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT DANIEL DRASIN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/24/2015. (dhans, )
March 23, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Defendant Daniel Drasin's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. By Judge William J. Martinez on 3/23/2015.(alowe)
February 23, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss. The above-captioned action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay its or their own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/23/2015.(alowe)
January 23, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Defendant Daniel Drasin's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Daniel Drasin are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court cannot definitively conclude on this record that amendment of the Complaint would be futile, Plaintiff may, on or before 2/13/2015 amend its Complaint should it be able to allege plausible, substantiated facts that would support personal jurisdiction over Defendant Daniel Drasin consistent wit h this Order. This action remains pending as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants John Does 1-10. The stay previously imposed by United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix (ECF No. 40 ) is LIFTED. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/23/2015.(alowe)
July 30, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Defendant Daniel Drasins Motion to Stay Disclosures and Discovery Pending Resolution of His Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all disclosure and discovery is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss 31 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/30/2014.(evana, )
April 2, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiffs Status Report and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall accept Plaintiffs Verified Amended Complaint and Jury Demand [23-1] for filing as of March 25, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/2014.(evana, )
March 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Expedited Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/11/2013.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Career Technologies, Inc. v. John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Career Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?