Martinez v. Quinn et al
Plaintiff: Glenice Martinez
Defendant: James (I) Quinn, James Quinn, Peggy Heil, Tom Clements, Peggy (I) Heil and Tom (I) Clements
Case Number: 1:2013cv00400
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff. ORDERED that Defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED by Clerk on 03/18/14. (jhawk, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/17/14.(jhawk, )
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants' 12 , 13 Motions to Dismiss are denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/13.(mnfsl, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, the Plaintiff shall serve the Second Amended Complaint on the newly added Defendant(s), as applicable. Defendants already served shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and all applicable local and federal rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/25/13.(mnfsl, )
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery. The proceedings of this case are hereby temporarily stayed pending the District Court's ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/6/2013 is vacated. The parties are directed to submit a status report within five days of the entry of any order adjudicating the pending Motions to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/3/13.(mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Quinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy (I) Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenice Martinez
Represented By: John Kenneth Pineau
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?