Plummer v. McDermott et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Plummer
Defendant: McDermott, Allred, McRoy and Cink
Case Number: 1:2013cv00440
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 2/19/2014. (cmacd)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 71 Report and Recommendations, and granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/18/14. Plaintiff's objection 73 is overruled. (dkals, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 13-cv-02613-BNB by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/16/13. (dkals, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 61 Joinder of Parties Motion, and granting 56 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/30/13.(dkals, )
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to Show Cause in Civil Action 13-cv-02613-BNB by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/25/13. (dkals, )
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER to Amend Caption by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/24/13. (dkals, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Lack of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies and Motion for Stay. All proceedings with respect to defendants McDermott, Allred, and Cink are stayed until further order of the court following a ruling on the Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 37-1). It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall have up to and including July 22, 2013, to file a response to the Defendants Motion for S ummary Judgment (Docket No. 37-1). It is further ORDERED that the Show Cause Hearing remains set on July 9, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. at which plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed as against defendant McRoy for failure to serve and failure to prosecute. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/25/13. (alvsl)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER : Denying 30 plaintiff's "Interlocutory Motion to Show Cause". Show Cause Hearing remains set 7/9/2013 02:00 PM. Denying 31 "Interlocutory Motion to Compel". By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/14/2013.(mjwcd)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/23/13.(dkals, )
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 5/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/19/2013. (mjwcd)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants Daniels, Jane Doe, and John Doe are DISMISSED.The claims against Defendants McDermott, Allred, McRoy, and Cink shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/9/13. (sgrim)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/01/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. McDermott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?