German v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Rachel German
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv00551
Filed: March 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/22/15.(jhawk, )
March 27, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/26/15. ORDERED: The August 27, 2012 decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff was not disabled is REVERSED. ORDERED: This case is remanded for an award of benefits. (kpreu)
November 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 9 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Defendants Brief due by 12/2/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/17/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/4/13. (mnfsl, )
October 31, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND AND VACATING SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 ORDER REMANDING CASE. This case should be reopened for further proceedings.The 9/10/2013 Order is therefore rescinded and the 16 Judgment entered on that Order is vacat ed. The government's 14 Motion to Remand is denied. This matter shall proceed to full briefing on Plaintiff's appeal. Counsel for theparties shall confer on a modification of the operative JCMP to provide dates certain for the filing of the government's Response and Plaintiffs Reply. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/31/13.(mnfsl, )
September 10, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 15 Order. By Clerk on 9/10/13. (mnfsl, )
June 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/9/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/8/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/23/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/3/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: German v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel German
Represented By: Christa Ann McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?